EP1757229 - ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSING APPARATUS AND ULTRASONIC IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.05.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 28.06.2017 [2017/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta, Inc. 2-7-2 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-7015 / JP | [2014/21] |
Former [2008/47] | For all designated states Panasonic Corporation 1006, Oaza Kadoma Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | ||
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC INDUSTRIAL CO., LTD. 1006 Oaza Kadoma, Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-8501 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Kinya c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | 02 /
HAMAMOTO, Masahiro c/o Matsushita Electric Industrial Co., Ltd. IP Development Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | [2016/15] |
Former [2007/09] | 01 /
HASEGAWA, Kinya Matsushita Electric Ind. Co., Ltd. IP Development Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | ||
02 /
HAMAMOTO, Masahiro Matsushita Electric Ind. Co.Ltd IP Development Center, 19F Matsushita IMP Bldg. 1-3-7 Shiromi, Chuo-ku, Osaka 540-6319 / JP | Representative(s) | Bröcher, Dirk Joachim, et al Brucknerstr. 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2014/12] |
Former [2008/23] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05739264.9 | 13.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005JP08808 | Priority number, date | JP20040145710 | 14.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004145710 | [2007/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005110237 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1757229 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1757229 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61B8/12 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61B8/00 (KR);
A61B8/12 (EP,KR,US);
A61B8/4461 (EP,US);
A61B8/463 (EP,US);
A61B8/466 (EP,US);
A61B8/483 (EP,US);
G01N29/24 (KR);
G01S15/8993 (EP,US);
G01S7/52061 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2016/15] |
Former [2007/34] | DE | ||
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ULTRASCHALLDIAGNOSEGERÄT UND ULTRASCHALLBILD-DARSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2007/09] | English: | ULTRASONIC DIAGNOSING APPARATUS AND ULTRASONIC IMAGE DISPLAY METHOD | [2007/09] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIAGNOSE À ULTRASONS ET PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE D'IMAGE ULTRASONIQUE | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.11.2006 | Translation filed | 10.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 10.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 10.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 18.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.02.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.09.2009 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 16.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | DE | 01.12.2016 | [2017/26] | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6248074 (OHNO MASAHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,6-8 * column 9, lines 24-26 * * column 12, lines 30-35 * * column 17, lines 50-52 * * figures 2,3,6,9-15,17,18,26-28,31-33,35-37 *; | [PX]US2004249287 (KAWASHIMA TOMONAO [JP], et al) [PX] 1,6-8 * figures 1,10,12-15,17,18,20 *; | [X]US2004081340 (HASHIMOTO KEISUKE [JP]) [X] 1,6-8 * figures 1,9,11,28 *; | [A]US2004087854 (UEDA MASAAKI [JP]) [A] 1,2 * figures 1,2,6,11,13,31,32 * | International search | [X]JP2004049426 (ALOKA CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003325513 (ALOKA CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002078710 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) | by applicant | US6248074 | US2004249287 | US2004081340 |