EP1744772 - FLAXSEEDS FOR BODY WEIGHT MANAGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.06.2018 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.02.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Copenhagen Nørregade 10 1165 Copenhagen K / DK | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/33] | For all designated states University of Copenhagen Panum, Blegdamsvej 3B 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | ||
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states University of Copenhagen Panum, Blegdamsvej 3B 2200 Copenhagen N / DK | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Den KGL. Veterinaer- OG Landbohojskole Bülowsvej 17 1870 Frederiksberg C / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASTRUP, Arne, Vernon Fabritius Allé 4 2930 Klampenborg / DK | 02 /
TETENS, Inge Klakkebjerg 95, Jonstrup 2750 Ballerup / DK | 03 /
THOMSEN, Agnete, Dal Saturnvej 8 8260 Viby J / DK | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2017/33] |
Former [2009/30] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2008/31] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 P.O. Box 831 2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK | ||
Former [2007/04] | Plougmann & Vingtoft A/S Sundkrogsgade 9 2100 Copenhagen / DK | Application number, filing date | 05739567.5 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005DK00314 | Priority number, date | DK20040000742 | 10.05.2004 Original published format: DK 200400742 | US20040569252P | 10.05.2004 Original published format: US 569252 P | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005107777 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744772 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1744772 | Date: | 16.08.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/38, A61P3/04, A61K36/55, A23L7/10 | [2016/46] | CPC: |
A21D2/266 (EP,US);
A21D13/02 (EP,US);
A21D13/04 (EP,US);
A21D13/047 (EP);
A21D13/068 (EP);
A21D13/40 (EP);
A21D2/36 (EP,US);
A23L7/10 (EP,US);
A23L7/115 (EP,US);
A61K36/55 (EP,US);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K36/55, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2200/32, A23V2250/21, A23V2250/5106 (US,EP) |
Former IPC [2007/04] | A61K35/38, A61P3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/33] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LEINSAMEN ZUR KONTROLLE DES KÖRPERGEWICHTES | [2016/46] | English: | FLAXSEEDS FOR BODY WEIGHT MANAGEMENT | [2007/04] | French: | GRAINES DE LIN PERMETTANT DE GERER LE POIDS DU CORPS | [2007/04] |
Former [2007/04] | FLACHSSAMEN FÜR DIE KONTROLLE DES KÖRPERGEWICHTS | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 24.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2017 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.03.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17186266.7 / EP3263118 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2010 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 08.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 26.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Licence(s) | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | Flax-Slim APS Høyrups Allé 20 2900 Hellerup / DK | Date: | 22.06.2017 | ID: | 01 02/exclusive | For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | Licencee: | InQpharm Group Sdn. Bhd. E-16 Plaza Mont Kiara 2 Jalan Kiara 50480 Kuala Lumpur / MY | Date: | 15.08.2017 | [2019/24] |
Former [2017/44] | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Licencee: | Flax-Slim APS Høyrups Allé 20 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Date: | 22.06.2017 | ||
ID: | 01 02/not-exclusive | ||
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Licencee: | InQpharm Group Sdn. Bhd. E-16 Plaza Mont Kiara 2 Jalan Kiara 50480 Kuala Lumpur / MY | ||
Date: | 15.08.2017 | ||
[2019/24] | |||
Former [2017/42] | ID: | 01 01/exclusive | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Licencee: | Flax-Slim APS Høyrups Allé 20 2900 Hellerup / DK | ||
Date: | 22.06.2017 | ||
[2017/44] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2005 | AT | 16.08.2017 | CY | 16.08.2017 | CZ | 16.08.2017 | EE | 16.08.2017 | FI | 16.08.2017 | LT | 16.08.2017 | MC | 16.08.2017 | PT | 16.08.2017 | RO | 16.08.2017 | SE | 16.08.2017 | SI | 16.08.2017 | SK | 16.08.2017 | BG | 16.11.2017 | GR | 17.11.2017 | IS | 16.12.2017 | LU | 10.05.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 10.05.2005 | |
AT | 16.08.2017 | ||
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
PT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.05.2018 | ||
Former [2019/06] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
MC | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SI | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
EE | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
RO | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
SK | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
CZ | 16.08.2017 | ||
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/12] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
BG | 16.11.2017 | ||
GR | 17.11.2017 | ||
IS | 16.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 16.08.2017 | |
FI | 16.08.2017 | ||
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
SE | 16.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/08] | FI | 16.08.2017 | |
LT | 16.08.2017 | ||
Former [2018/07] | LT | 16.08.2017 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE3739700 (JESCHKE GUENTHER DR MED [DE]) [X] 20-22 * claim 25 *; | [Y]US4857326 (STITT PAUL A [US]) [Y] 1-35 * example - *; | [X]WO9321774 (LORIA ROGER M [US]) [X] 20,21 * claim - *; | [X]US5612074 (LEACH ROBIN L [US]) [X] 20-23,25,26 * column 8, line 43 - line 63 *; | [DX]WO0019842 (HK RUOKATALO OYJ [FI], et al) [DX] 20,24,27 * page 7, line 16 - line 33 *; | [Y]US6579544 (ROSENBERG THOMAS D [US], et al) [Y] 1-35 * column 19, line 35 - line 67 *; | [PX]EP1491099 (SUNTORY LTD [JP]) [PX] 1,2,4-10,13-17,28-30,33-35* paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0022]; claim 22 *; | [X] - BHATHENA SAM J ET AL, "Effects of dietary soybean and flaxseed meal on metabolic parameters in a genetic model of obesity and diabetes", FASEB JOURNAL, & ANNUAL MEETING OF PROFESSIONAL RESEARCH SCIENTISTS ON EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY; NEW ORLEANS, LOUISIANA, USA; APRIL 20-24, 2002, (20020322), vol. 16, no. 5, ISSN 0892-6638, page A1013, XP008050724 [X] 1-10,13,16-19,28-30,33-35 *abstract no: 740.5* | [X] - OOMAH B DAVE, "Flaxseed as a functional food source", JOURNAL OF THE SCIENCE OF FOOD AND AGRICULTURE, (200107), vol. 81, no. 9, ISSN 0022-5142, pages 889 - 894, XP002339130 [X] 1-10,28-30,33-35 * page 891, column 2, paragraph 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/jsfa.898 | [Y] - MADHUSUDHAN K T ET AL, "EFFECT OF HEAT ON THE FUNCTIONAL PROPERTIES OF LINSEED MEAL", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, (1985), vol. 33, no. 6, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 1222 - 1226, XP008041808 [Y] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf00066a052 | [DY] - CUNNANE STEPHEN C ET AL, "High alpha-linolenic acid flaxseed (Linum usitatissimum): Some nutritional properties in humans", BRITISH JOURNAL OF NUTRITION, (1993), vol. 69, no. 2, ISSN 0007-1145, pages 443 - 453, XP008041841 [DY] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1079/BJN19930046 | [A] - LUCAS EDRALIN A ET AL, "Flaxseed reduces plasma cholesterol and atherosclerotic lesion formation in ovariectomized Golden Syrian hamsters", ATHEROSCLEROSIS, (200404), vol. 173, no. 2, ISSN 0021-9150, pages 223 - 229, XP002314748 [A] 1-35 * page 229, column 1, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.atherosclerosis.2003.12.032 | [A] - FROTZ H ET AL, "[Changes in the fecal fatty acid pattern following linseed oil administration and its diagnostic significance in the assessment of fat absorption]", VERHANDLUNGEN DER DEUTSCHEN GESELLSCHAFT FUR INNERE MEDIZIN. 1969, (1969), vol. 75, ISSN 0070-4067, pages 666 - 669, XP008041826 [A] 1-34 * the whole document * | [A] - VELASQUEZ MANUEL T ET AL, "Dietary flaxseed meal reduces proteinuria and ameliorates nephropathy in an animal model of type II diabetes mellitus.", KIDNEY INTERNATIONAL, (200312), vol. 64, no. 6, ISSN 0085-2538, pages 2100 - 2107, XP008050642 [A] 1-35 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1523-1755.2003.00329.x | Examination | WO9316707 | WO9735594 | WO0049896 | WO0174179 | WO0187075 | - HOLLANDER P, "ORLISTAT IN THE TREATMENT OF OBESITY", PRIMARY CARE, SAUNDERS, LONDON, GB, (20030101), vol. 30, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0095-4543(03)00042-3, ISSN 0095-4543, pages 427 - 440, XP001183450 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0095-4543(03)00042-3 | - METTE KRISTENSEN ET AL, "Flaxseed dietary fibers lower cholesterol and increase fecal fat excretion, but magnitude of effect depend on food type", NUTRITION & METABOLISM, BIOMED CENTRAL. LONDON, GB, (20120203), vol. 9, no. 1, doi:10.1186/1743-7075-9-8, ISSN 1743-7075, page 8, XP021118951 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1743-7075-9-8 |