EP1725477 - COVERING DEVICE FOR A LIQUID PRODUCT DISPENSING MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.01.2011 | Opposition rejected | published on 16.02.2011 [2011/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states REXAM DISPENSING SYSTEMS 15 bis, Route Nationale 76470 Le Tréport / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2006/48] | For all designated states REXAM DISPENSING SYSTEMS 15 bis, route Nationale 76470 Le Tréport / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLOC, Richard 7, impasse des Marettes 76370 Derchigny-Graincourt / FR | 02 /
LOMPECH, Hervé 21, rue de Saint Etienne Ansennes 80220 Bouttencourt / FR | [2007/24] |
Former [2006/48] | 01 /
BLOC, Richard 7, impasse des Marettes F-76370 Derchigny-Graincourt / FR | ||
02 /
LOMPECH, Hervé 21, rue de Saint Etienne Ansennes F-80220 Bouttencourt / FR | Representative(s) | Sayettat, Julien Christian STRATO-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | Sayettat, Julien Christian Strato-IP 18, rue Soleillet 75020 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/42] | Novagraaf IP 3 Avenue de l'Opéra 75001 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2006/48] | Breese Derambure Majerowicz 38, avenue de l'Opéra 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05739593.1 | 16.03.2005 | [2006/48] | WO2005FR00638 | Priority number, date | FR20040002779 | 17.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0402779 | [2006/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005100205 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1725477 | Date: | 29.11.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1725477 | Date: | 13.06.2007 | Language: | FR | [2007/24] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 27.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B65D83/16 | [2006/48] | CPC: |
B05B11/0037 (EP,US);
B65D83/384 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/48] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABDECKVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN ABGABEELEMENT FÜR EIN FLÜSSIGES PRODUKT | [2006/48] | English: | COVERING DEVICE FOR A LIQUID PRODUCT DISPENSING MEMBER | [2006/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF POUR L'HABILLAGE D'UN ORGANE DE DISTRIBUTION DE PRODUIT LIQUIDE | [2006/48] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2005 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2005 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2005 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.11.2005 | Examination requested [2006/48] | 26.02.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.04.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 07.04.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2008
18.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Valois S.A.S Le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR Opponent's representative Kohler, Pierre, et al, et al CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/17] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.03.2008
18.03.2008
ADMISSIBLE Valois S.A.S Le Prieuré 27110 Le Neubourg / FR Opponent's representative Kohler, Pierre, et al, et al CAPRI 33, rue de Naples 75008 Paris / FR | 17.04.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 18.07.2008 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 03.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the opposition division | 21.09.2010 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2011/07] | 21.09.2010 | Date of oral proceedings | 29.09.2010 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 29.09.2010 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.06.2007 | CY | 13.06.2007 | CZ | 13.06.2007 | DK | 13.06.2007 | EE | 13.06.2007 | FI | 13.06.2007 | GB | 13.06.2007 | IE | 13.06.2007 | LT | 13.06.2007 | NL | 13.06.2007 | PL | 13.06.2007 | RO | 13.06.2007 | SI | 13.06.2007 | SK | 13.06.2007 | TR | 13.06.2007 | BG | 13.09.2007 | SE | 13.09.2007 | GR | 14.09.2007 | IS | 13.10.2007 | PT | 13.11.2007 | HU | 14.12.2007 | LU | 16.03.2008 | BE | 31.03.2008 | MC | 31.03.2008 | CH | 31.03.2009 | LI | 31.03.2009 | [2010/39] |
Former [2010/33] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
LU | 16.03.2008 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
CH | 31.03.2009 | ||
LI | 31.03.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CY | 13.06.2007 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
EE | 13.06.2007 | ||
FI | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
BE | 31.03.2008 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/46] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
MC | 31.03.2008 | ||
Former [2008/28] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
RO | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/22] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
DK | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/21] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
GB | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
GR | 14.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/14] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SK | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/12] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
CZ | 13.06.2007 | ||
IE | 13.06.2007 | ||
LT | 13.06.2007 | ||
NL | 13.06.2007 | ||
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
BG | 13.09.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
IS | 13.10.2007 | ||
PT | 13.11.2007 | ||
Former [2008/07] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SI | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | ||
Former [2007/52] | AT | 13.06.2007 | |
PL | 13.06.2007 | ||
SE | 13.09.2007 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE29610372U (HOLTHOFF MARTIN [DE]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 25 - page 6, line L; figure 1 *; | [A]US6003739 (BARTLETT LOUIE E [US], et al) [A] 1-10* column 3, line 4 - line 44; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US6588629 (DE POUS OLIVIER [FR]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 43 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [A]US2003127468 (LOGHMAN-ADHAM KAMRAN [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0049]; figure 1 * |