EP1728164 - METHOD FOR THE SOFTWARE EMULATION OF THE HARD DISKS OF A COMPUTER PLATFORM AT THE OPERATING SYSTEM THEREOF, WITH ON-THE-FLY PARAMETER-ADAPTIVE MANAGEMENT OF READ AND WRITE REQUESTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.10.2013 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 03.08.2016 [2016/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston, TX 77070 / US | [2012/48] |
Former [2008/39] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 20555 S.H. 249 Houston TX 77070 / US | ||
Former [2007/21] | For all designated states Neoware Systems, Inc. 3200 Horizon Drive King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | ||
Former [2006/49] | For all designated states Qualystem Technology 12 Avenue Raspail 94250 Gentilly / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GATTEGNO, Yves 11, rue de Metz F-94240 l'Hay les Roses / FR | [2006/49] | Representative(s) | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | [2012/48] |
Former [2009/29] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2008/20] | Schoppe, Fritz, et al Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246 82043 Pullach bei München / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie, et al Cabinet Moutard, 35, rue de la Paroisse 78000 Versailles / FR | ||
Former [2006/49] | de Saint-Palais, Arnaud Marie Cabinet Moutard, 35, rue de la Paroisse 78000 Versailles / FR | Application number, filing date | 05739678.0 | 14.03.2005 | [2006/49] | WO2005FR00609 | Priority number, date | FR20040002771 | 16.03.2004 Original published format: FR 0402771 | [2006/49] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005101202 | Date: | 27.10.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1728164 | Date: | 06.12.2006 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1728164 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/10 | [2006/49] | CPC: |
G06F13/105 (EP);
G06F3/0607 (EP);
G06F3/0622 (EP);
G06F3/0664 (EP);
G06F3/0674 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/49] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SOFTWAREEMULATION DER FESTPLATTEN EINER RECHNERPLATTFORM AM BETRIEBSSYSTEM DAVON MIT PARAMETERADAPTIVER ON-THE-FLY-VERWALTUNG VON LESE-/SCHREIB-ANFORDERUNGEN | [2006/49] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SOFTWARE EMULATION OF THE HARD DISKS OF A COMPUTER PLATFORM AT THE OPERATING SYSTEM THEREOF, WITH ON-THE-FLY PARAMETER-ADAPTIVE MANAGEMENT OF READ AND WRITE REQUESTS | [2006/49] | French: | PROCEDE POUR L'EMULATION LOGICIELLE DE DISQUES DURS D'UNE PLATE-FORME INFORMATIQUE AU NIVEAU DU SYSTEME D'EXPLOITATION AVEC GESTION PARAMETRABLE A LA VOLEE DES REQUETES D'ECRITURE ET DE LECTURE | [2006/49] | Entry into regional phase | 29.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2006 | Examination requested [2006/49] | 23.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.10.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 11.10.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.08.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.03.2005 | AT | 28.11.2012 | CY | 28.11.2012 | CZ | 28.11.2012 | DK | 28.11.2012 | EE | 28.11.2012 | FI | 28.11.2012 | IS | 28.11.2012 | IT | 28.11.2012 | LT | 28.11.2012 | NL | 28.11.2012 | PL | 28.11.2012 | RO | 28.11.2012 | SE | 28.11.2012 | SI | 28.11.2012 | SK | 28.11.2012 | TR | 28.11.2012 | BG | 28.02.2013 | GR | 01.03.2013 | ES | 11.03.2013 | IE | 14.03.2013 | LU | 14.03.2013 | PT | 28.03.2013 | BE | 31.03.2013 | CH | 31.03.2013 | LI | 31.03.2013 | MC | 31.03.2013 | FR | 02.04.2013 | [2016/31] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 14.03.2005 | |
AT | 28.11.2012 | ||
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
IE | 14.03.2013 | ||
LU | 14.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
TR | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
IE | 14.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
IE | 14.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
BE | 31.03.2013 | ||
CH | 31.03.2013 | ||
LI | 31.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
IE | 14.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
FR | 02.04.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
MC | 31.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
IT | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
NL | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
RO | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/35] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
CZ | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
EE | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
SK | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
DK | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
BG | 28.02.2013 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 28.11.2012 | |
CY | 28.11.2012 | ||
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
PT | 28.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/26] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
SI | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/24] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
GR | 01.03.2013 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.11.2012 | |
FI | 28.11.2012 | ||
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
PL | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | FI | 28.11.2012 | |
LT | 28.11.2012 | ||
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
ES | 11.03.2013 | ||
Former [2013/21] | LT | 28.11.2012 | |
SE | 28.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | LT | 28.11.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2003191623 (SALMONSEN DANIEL R [US]) [X] 1-46 * column 1, paragraph 6 - paragraph 10 * * column 3, paragraph 39 - paragraph 44 * * column 4, paragraph 52 - paragraph 54 * * column A; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US6574588 (SHAPIRO DANIEL [US], et al) [A] 1-41 * column 2, line 24 - column 3, line 7 * * column 4, line 12 - column 5, line 34 * * column A; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US5131089 (COLE JAMES F [US]) [A] 1-41 * column A; figures 1-3 * |