EP1761349 - CONTINUOUS CASTING PLANT AND METHOD FOR OPTIONALLY CASTING A LARGE METAL BILLET OR A MAXIMUM OF TWO NARROWER METAL BILLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2009 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH & Co Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2008/35] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH Reithallenstrasse 1 77731 Willstätt-Legelshurst / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states Voest-Alpine Industrieanlagenbau GmbH & Co Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÖTTCHER, Kurt Liebermannweg 38 A-4060 Leonding / AT | 02 /
BRAMERDORFER, Heinz Blütenstrasse 17 A-4040 Linz / AT | 03 /
ENGEL, Kurt Am Ipfbach 68 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | 04 /
FLICK, Andreas Donatusgasse 8 A-4020 Linz / AT | 05 /
GUTTENBRUNNER, Josef Alte Weinstrasse 1 A-4522 Sierning / AT | 06 /
HOLZER, Karl St. Johann 59 A-3352 St. Peter / AT | 07 /
KALMAR, Istvan Am Feldrain 7 A-4052 Ansfelden / AT | 08 /
KRIEGNER, Othmar Giselherstrasse 2 A-4300 St. Valentin / AT | 09 /
LANSCHÜTZER, Josef Haid 1 A-4310 Mauthausen / AT | 10 /
MÖRWALD, Karl Im Aichetfeld 17 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | 11 /
ORTNER, Arthur Andreas-Plenk-Strasse 16 A-4020 Linz / AT | 12 /
SCHEURECKER, Werner Prechtlerstrasse 15 A-4030 Linz / AT | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
BÖTTCHER, Kurt Liebermannweg 38 A-4060 Leonding / AT | ||
02 /
BRAMERDORFER, Heinz Blütenstrasse 17 A-4040 Linz / AT | |||
03 /
ENGEL, Kurt Am Ipfbach 68 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | |||
04 /
FLICK, Andreas Donatusgasse 8 A-4020 Linz / AT | |||
05 /
GUTTENBRUNNER, Josef Alte Weinstrasse 1 A-4522 Sierning / AT | |||
06 /
HOLZER, Karl St. Johann 59 A-3352 St. Peter / AT | |||
07 /
KALMAR, Istvan Am Feldrain 7 A-4052 Ansfelden / AT | |||
08 /
KRIEGNER, Othmar Giselherstrasse 2 A-4300 St. Valentin / AT | |||
09 /
LANSCHÜTZER, Josef Haid 1 A-4310 Mauthausen / AT | |||
10 /
MÖRWALD, Karl Im Aichetfeld 17 A-4490 St. Florian / AT | |||
11 /
ORTNER, Arthur Hamerlingstrasse 21 A-4020 Linz / AT | |||
12 /
SCHEURECKER, Werner Prechtlerstrasse 15 A-4030 Linz / AT | Representative(s) | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/02] | Maier, Daniel Oliver, et al Siemens AG CT IP Com E Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | Berg, Peter Siemens AG Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05739881.0 | 28.04.2005 | [2007/11] | WO2005EP04570 | Priority number, date | AT20040001004 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: AT 10042004 | [2007/11] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005120746 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1761349 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1761349 | Date: | 03.09.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/14 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
B22D11/147 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/11] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STRANGGIESSANLAGE UND VERFAHREN ZUM WAHLWEISEN GIESSEN EINES BREITEN METALLSTRANGES ODER MAXIMAL ZWEIER DEMGEGENÜBER SCHMÄLERER METALLSTRÄNGE | [2007/11] | English: | CONTINUOUS CASTING PLANT AND METHOD FOR OPTIONALLY CASTING A LARGE METAL BILLET OR A MAXIMUM OF TWO NARROWER METAL BILLETS | [2007/11] | French: | INSTALLATION DE COULEE CONTINUE ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT AU CHOIX DE COULER UNE LARGE BARRE METALLIQUE OU UN MAXIMUM DE DEUX BARRES METALLIQUES ETROITES | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 08.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 08.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 09.03.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 03.09.2008 | CZ | 03.09.2008 | DK | 03.09.2008 | EE | 03.09.2008 | FI | 03.09.2008 | IE | 03.09.2008 | LT | 03.09.2008 | NL | 03.09.2008 | PL | 03.09.2008 | RO | 03.09.2008 | SI | 03.09.2008 | SK | 03.09.2008 | TR | 03.09.2008 | BG | 03.12.2008 | SE | 03.12.2008 | GR | 04.12.2008 | ES | 14.12.2008 | IS | 03.01.2009 | PT | 03.02.2009 | HU | 04.03.2009 | AT | 28.04.2009 | GB | 28.04.2009 | LU | 28.04.2009 | BE | 30.04.2009 | CH | 30.04.2009 | LI | 30.04.2009 | MC | 30.04.2009 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
HU | 04.03.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
LU | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
GR | 04.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
AT | 28.04.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/25] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
BE | 30.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/23] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
PL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
GB | 28.04.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
MC | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
SE | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
CH | 30.04.2009 | ||
LI | 30.04.2009 | ||
Former [2009/48] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
DK | 03.09.2008 | ||
EE | 03.09.2008 | ||
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 03.09.2008 | |
FI | 03.09.2008 | ||
IE | 03.09.2008 | ||
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
RO | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
SK | 03.09.2008 | ||
BG | 03.12.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
IS | 03.01.2009 | ||
PT | 03.02.2009 | ||
Former [2009/14] | FI | 03.09.2008 | |
LT | 03.09.2008 | ||
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
SI | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/12] | LT | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | ||
ES | 14.12.2008 | ||
Former [2009/10] | LT | 03.09.2008 | |
NL | 03.09.2008 | Cited in | International search | [XD]DE2702894 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND) [XD] 19,20 * figure 1 * * page 4, paragraph 3 - page 5, paragraph 1 * * page 6, lines 6,7, paragraph 2 ** page 6, paragraph 4 * |