EP1734835 - USE OF y-AMINOBUTANOIC ACID FOR MASKING OR REDUCING AN UNPLEASANT FLAVOR IMPRESSION, AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING y-AMINOBUTANOIC ACID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.05.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Refusal of application | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2006/52] | For all designated states Symrise GmbH & Co. KG Mühlenfeldstrasse 1 37603 Holzminden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEY, Jakob Schubertstrasse 5a 37603 Holzminden / DE | 02 /
KINDEL, Günter Grabenstrasse 1 37671 Höxter / DE | 03 /
KRAMMER, Gerhard Wagnerstrasse 4 37603 Holzminden / DE | 04 /
HOFMANN, Thomas Tischlerweg 5 48161 Münster-Roxel / DE | 05 /
ROTZOLL, Nina Holbeinstrasse 14 22607 Hamburg / DE | [2006/52] | Representative(s) | Eisenführ Speiser Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte PartGmbB Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/40] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | ||
Former [2006/52] | Eisenführ, Speiser & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 60 78 28060 Bremen / DE | Application number, filing date | 05740177.0 | 29.03.2005 | [2006/52] | WO2005EP51424 | Priority number, date | DE20041017076 | 07.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004017076 | [2006/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005096841 | Date: | 20.10.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1734835 | Date: | 27.12.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.10.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.10.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/22 | [2006/52] | CPC: |
A61Q11/00 (EP,US);
A23L27/82 (EP,US);
A23L27/84 (EP,US);
A23L27/86 (EP,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,US);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/16, A23V2250/038 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/52] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON y-AMINOBUTTERSÄURE ZUR MASKIERUNG ODER VERMINDERUNG EINES UNANGENEHMEN GESCHMACKSEINDRUCKS SOWIE ZUBEREITUNGEN ENTHALTEND y-AMINOBUTTERSÄURE | [2006/52] | English: | USE OF y-AMINOBUTANOIC ACID FOR MASKING OR REDUCING AN UNPLEASANT FLAVOR IMPRESSION, AND PREPARATIONS CONTAINING y-AMINOBUTANOIC ACID | [2006/52] | French: | UTILISATION D'ACIDE y-AMINOBUTYRIQUE AFIN DE MASQUER OU DE REDUIRE L'IMPRESSION DE MAUVAISE ODEUR ET PREPARATION CONTENANT DE L'ACIDE y-AMINOBUTYRIQUE | [2006/52] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2006 | Examination requested [2006/52] | 23.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.01.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 27.01.2010 | 27.01.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2010/25] | 18.02.2010 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2010/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000166502 ; | [X]WO8600004 (GODFREY SCIENCE & DESIGN INC [US]) [X] 1-5,7 * page 1, line 9 - line 14 * * page 6, line 1 * * claims 1-6,17 *; | [X]US5631038 (KURTZ ROBERT J [US], et al) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * column 1, line 9 - line 12 * * claims 5,8 *; | [X]GB1337086 (TATE & LYLE LTD) [X] 1-3,5,7,8 * the whole document *; | [X]US5494667 (UCHIDA YUKIO [JP], et al) [X] 3,6 * column 2, line 38 - line 45 * * column 5, line 6 - line 19 *; | [A]JP2000014356 ; | [A]JP2001327258 ; | [A]JP2003310214 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000166502 A 20000620 (LOTTE CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20000831), vol. 2000, no. 04, & JP2000014356 A 20000118 (YAKULT HONSHA CO LTD) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020403), vol. 2002, no. 03, & JP2001327258 A 20011127 (NATIONAL AGRICULTURAL RESEARCH ORGANIZATION; SERESU CORPORATION:KK; SA) [A] * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003310214 A 20031105 (ITO HIROSHI; KATO YOJI; NORO OSAMU) [A] * abstract * |