EP1763205 - COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, TRANSFER CONTROL METHOD, TELEPHONE DEVICE USED FOR SAME, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.08.2010 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.09.2010 [2010/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAKATA, Kazuhiro, c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1088001 / JP | 02 /
KURASHIMA, Akihisa, c/o NEC CORPORATION 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1088001 / JP | [2007/11] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/11] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05740902.1 | 18.05.2005 | [2007/11] | WO2005JP09033 | Priority number, date | JP20040192392 | 30.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004192392 | [2007/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006003758 | Date: | 12.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763205 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.07.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/00, H04M3/54 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
H04M3/54 (EP,KR,US);
H04M1/006 (EP,KR,US);
H04M7/0027 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/15] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSSYSTEM, TRANSFERSTEUERVERFAHREN, DAFÜR VERWENDETE TELEFONEINRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSEINRICHTUNG UND PROGRAMM | [2007/11] | English: | COMMUNICATION SYSTEM, TRANSFER CONTROL METHOD, TELEPHONE DEVICE USED FOR SAME, COMMUNICATION DEVICE, AND PROGRAM | [2007/11] | French: | SYSTEME DE COMMUNICATION, PROCEDE DE CONTROLE DE TRANSFERT, APPAREIL TELEPHONIQUE UTILISE POUR CELUI-CI, APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2006 | Translation filed | 24.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 04.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/36] | 20.04.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0223876 (AT & T WIRELESS SERVICES INC [US], et al) [A] * abstract * | International search | [X]JP2003087835 (TOSHIBA CORP) |