EP1680193 - FIRE-RETARDING DEVICE ON STORAGE TANKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.09.2011 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.10.2011 [2011/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exess Engineering GMBH Exerzierplatzstrasse 85 8051 Graz / AT | For all designated states Stuhlbacher, Franz Am Arlandgrund 45 8045 Graz / AT | [2009/30] |
Former [2006/29] | For all designated states EXESS ENGINEERING GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H. Andritzer Reichsstrasse 66 8045 Graz / AT | ||
For all designated states Stuhlbacher, Franz Am Arlandgrund 45 8045 Graz / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STUHLBACHER, Franz Am Arlandgrund 45 A-8045 Graz / AT | 02 /
KRAICZAR, Markus Pirkergasse 10 A-8570 Voitsberg / AT | [2006/29] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2009/24] |
Former [2006/29] | Gödl, Oswald Schnideritschstrasse 12 8054 Graz / AT | Application number, filing date | 05741658.8 | 19.05.2005 | [2006/29] | WO2005AT00169 | Priority number, date | AT20040000932 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: AT 9322004 | [2006/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005115551 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1680193 | Date: | 19.07.2006 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2006/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A62C3/06 | [2006/29] | CPC: |
A62C3/06 (EP,US);
A62C2/06 (US);
A62C2/065 (US);
A62C2/10 (US);
A62C3/002 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2006/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRANDHEMMENDE EINRICHTUNG AN LAGERTANKS | [2006/29] | English: | FIRE-RETARDING DEVICE ON STORAGE TANKS | [2006/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF COUPE-FEU SUR DES RESERVOIRS DE STOCKAGE | [2006/29] | Entry into regional phase | 02.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.02.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.02.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.02.2006 | Examination requested [2006/29] | 08.03.2006 | Observations by third parties | 26.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.12.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/41] | 03.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.01.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/41] | 12.02.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.02.2010 | 16.02.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.06.2007 | Request for further processing for: | 16.11.2007 | Request for further processing filed | 28.11.2007 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.12.2007 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   11.01.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 22.04.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2010/12] | 01.09.2011 | Resumption of proceedings | [2011/28] | 22.04.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2011/28] | Cited in | International search | [X]GB1177538 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [X] 1 * page 2, column L, lines 3-6 * * page 2, column R, lines 124-129; figures 1,5,6 *; | [A]GB2028129 (EXPLOSAFE SA) [A] 2,3 * page 1, column R, lines 95-101; figure 5 *; | [A]US5794707 (ALHAMAD SHAIKH GHALEB MOHAMMAD [SA]) [A] 4 * column 3, lines 37-53; figure 1 *; | [A]US2004016340 (HEO CHEOL [KR]) [A] 5 * paragraph [0073]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]GB1454493 (SECR DEFENCE) [A] 6 * paragraph [0073]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US1404924 (RALPH BLOSS RICHARD) [A] 7,9 * figure - *; | [A]US4249669 (SZEGO ANDREW [CA]) [A] 8 * figure 1 * | by applicant | US5377765 | US3462040 | DE19703308 | other | WO2004091728 |