|
22.12.2011 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2011 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.03.2011 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2011 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.01.2011 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.09.2010 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.04.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.04.2009 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.01.2009 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.10.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.09.2008 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.07.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.07.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.05.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.05.2008 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
23.04.2008 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
17.12.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2007 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
13.04.2007 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2007 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
04.01.2007 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.12.2006 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.11.2006 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Notification of the recording of a change |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.09.2006 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.12.2005 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
17.11.2005 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
10 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
19 |
|
06.06.2005 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
1 |