EP1746943 - VARIABLE SIZE RETRIEVAL BASKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2012 [2012/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Limited P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings Christ Church Barbados, West Indies / BB | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHENG, Eric 4275 West Beech Lane Bloomington, IN 47404 / US | 02 /
TEAGUE, James, A. RR 5, Box 306 Spencer, IN 47460 / US | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Intès, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158 rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/46] | Intes, Didier Gérard André, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2008/35] | Joly, Jean-Jacques, et al Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2007/05] | Molnia, David df-mp Dörries Frank-Molnia & Pohlman Triftstrasse 13 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05742307.1 | 05.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005US15730 | Priority number, date | US20040568272P | 06.05.2004 Original published format: US 568272 P | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005107616 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1746943 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
A61B17/221 (EP,US);
A61B17/22 (EP,US);
A61B17/00234 (EP,US);
A61B17/32056 (EP,US);
A61B2017/00526 (EP,US);
A61B2017/2212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IE, NL [2007/33] |
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FANGKORB VARIABLER GRÖSSE | [2007/05] | English: | VARIABLE SIZE RETRIEVAL BASKET | [2007/05] | French: | PANIER D'EXTRACTION DE TAILLE VARIABLE | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 28.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 18.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.08.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.08.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/04] | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.04.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2011 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP1273268 (TERUMO CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1-37 * column 9, line 35 - column 10, line 45 * * column 15, line 80 - column 18, line 29 * * figures 11-14 *; | [X]US2002068944 (WHITE CURTIS [US], et al) [X] 1,17,24,31 * page 3, paragraph 58 - page 5, paragraph 80 * * figures 2-11 *; | [A]WO2004032769 (COOK UROLOGICAL INC [US]) [A] 10,11,17 * page 16, paragraph 50 * * figure 17 * | Examination | WO0071036 | US2004097964 | US2003204202 | by applicant | US20040568272 |