EP1756773 - SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR COLOR MATCHING OVERPRINTED DOCUMENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.02.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kodak Graphic Communications Canada Company 3700 Gilmore Way Burnaby, BC V5G 4M1 / CA | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAIRNS, Glen 1201 Hornby Street Coquitlam, British Columbia V3E 1M1 / CA | 02 /
KOUCHNAREV, Stan 9 Laurel Place Port Moody, British Columbia V3H 4N1 / CA | 03 /
AV-SHALOM, Amit 620 - W 21st Avenue Vancouver, British Columbia V5Z 1Y8 / CA | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Boite n 2 Zone d'activité SAONEOR 12 rue Alfred Kastler 71530 Fragnes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/41] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Etablissement de Chalon Campus Industriel - Département Brevets Route de Demigny - Z.I. Nord - B.P. 21 71102 Chalon-sur-Saône Cedex / FR | ||
Former [2007/09] | Weber, Etienne Nicolas Kodak Industrie Département Brevets - CRT 61/1 71102 Chalon sur Sâone Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05742540.7 | 05.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005CA00697 | Priority number, date | US20040567814P | 05.05.2004 Original published format: US 567814 P | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005106797 | Date: | 10.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756773 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1756773 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 10.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T11/00, G06T7/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
H04N1/6011 (EP,US);
H04N1/603 (EP,US);
H04N1/6052 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, GB [2007/32] |
Former [2007/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR FARBANPASSUNG VON ÜBERDRUCKTEN DOKUMENTEN | [2007/09] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHODS FOR COLOR MATCHING OVERPRINTED DOCUMENTS | [2007/09] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDES DE MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE DE COULEURS DE DOCUMENTS SURIMPRIMES | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 17.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 23.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 31.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.04.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 31.05.2012 | [2013/12] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5926185 (VYNCKE FRANK [BE], et al) [A] * column 5, line 45 - column 6, line 44; figures 4,5 *; | [X]EP0997850 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1 * paragraphs [0032] - [0040] *; | [A]EP1104918 (ADOBE SYSTEMS INC [US]) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]WO0171656 (IMATION CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 6, column 17 - page 9, column 27 * | International search | [A]US2001036311 (TOMOMATSU YOSHIAKI [JP]); | [A]US2002193956 (VAN DE CAPELLE JEAN-PIERRE [US], et al); | [A]US2004051884 (SAXTON TIMOTHY H [CA]) | by applicant | US5926185 | EP0997850 | WO0171656 |