EP1745086 - ELECTROLUMINESCENT POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Patent GmbH Frankfurter Strasse 250 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2007/04] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BÜSING, Arne Liederbacherstrasse 5 65929 Frankfurt / DE | 02 /
SCHEURICH, René Bertha von Suttner Strasse 34 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | 03 /
HEUN, Susanne Am Carlusbaum 23 65812 Bad Soden / DE | 04 /
MICHAELSEN, Ingrid Wilhelm-Umbach-Strasse 10 63225 Langen / DE | [2011/36] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
BÜSING, Arne Liederbacherstrasse 5 65929 Frankfurt / DE | ||
02 /
SCHEURICH, René Bertha von Suttner Strasse 34 64846 Gross-Zimmern / DE | |||
03 /
HEUN, Susanne Am Carlusbaum 23 65812 Bad Soden / DE | |||
04 /
BACH, Ingrid Gartenstrasse 2 65812 Bad Soden / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/52] | Application number, filing date | 05742884.9 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005EP05020 | Priority number, date | DE20041023278 | 11.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004023278 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005111113 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745086 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745086 | Date: | 28.12.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G73/00, C08G61/00, C08G61/12, C07F7/00, C07F7/08, C09K11/00, C09K11/06, H01L51/00, H01L51/30 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
H05B33/14 (EP,US);
C09K11/06 (EP,KR,US);
C08G61/00 (EP,US);
C08G61/12 (EP,US);
C08G73/00 (KR);
H10K85/151 (EP,US);
H10K85/342 (EP,US);
C09K2211/1433 (EP,US);
H10K50/11 (EP,US);
H10K85/115 (EP,US);
H10K85/40 (EP,US);
H10K85/631 (EP,US);
Y02E10/549 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | ELEKTROLUMINESZIERENDE POLYMERE | [2007/04] | English: | ELECTROLUMINESCENT POLYMERS | [2007/04] | French: | POLYMERES ELECTROLUMINESCENTS | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 08.10.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.09.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.09.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.10.2007 | Opposition(s) | 01.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.05.2005 | CY | 28.12.2011 | CZ | 28.12.2011 | DK | 28.12.2011 | EE | 28.12.2011 | FI | 28.12.2011 | IE | 28.12.2011 | IT | 28.12.2011 | LT | 28.12.2011 | NL | 28.12.2011 | PL | 28.12.2011 | RO | 28.12.2011 | SE | 28.12.2011 | SI | 28.12.2011 | SK | 28.12.2011 | TR | 28.12.2011 | BG | 28.03.2012 | GR | 29.03.2012 | ES | 08.04.2012 | IS | 28.04.2012 | PT | 30.04.2012 | AT | 10.05.2012 | GB | 10.05.2012 | LU | 10.05.2012 | BE | 31.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | FR | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 10.05.2012 | ||
GB | 10.05.2012 | ||
LU | 10.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
TR | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 10.05.2012 | ||
GB | 10.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
AT | 10.05.2012 | ||
GB | 10.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
FI | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 10.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 10.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
FR | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
ES | 08.04.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 10.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
GB | 10.05.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
BE | 31.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IT | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
DK | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
PL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
PT | 30.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
RO | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
SK | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
EE | 28.12.2011 | ||
IE | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
NL | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
BG | 28.03.2012 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
CZ | 28.12.2011 | ||
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
IS | 28.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 28.12.2011 | |
LT | 28.12.2011 | ||
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 28.12.2011 | |
SE | 28.12.2011 | ||
SI | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 28.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]DE3634281 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]EP0266693 (BASF AG [DE]); | [Y]FR2655655 (RHONE POULENC CHIMIE [FR]); | [Y]EP1138746 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]US6310231 (IGARASHI TATSUYA [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1245659 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [Y]WO02077060 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al); | [Y]WO03020790 (COVION ORGANIC SEMICONDUCTORS [DE], et al); | [Y]US6558819 (IGARASHI TATSUYA [JP]); | [Y]US2003186080 (KAMATANI JUN [JP], et al); | [Y]WO03092334 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2004015025 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]US2004072018 (HERRON NORMAN [US], et al); | [Y]WO2004035652 (SONY CHEMICALS CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]EP1553119 (SONY CHEMICALS CORP [JP]); | by applicant | DE3634281 | EP0266693 | FR2655655 | EP1138746 | US6310231 | WO02068435 | EP1245659 | WO02077060 | WO03020790 | US6558819 | US2003186080 | WO03092334 | WO2004015025 | US2004072018 | WO2004035652 | DE10350606 |