EP1748856 - CAMSHAFT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.2009 [2009/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daimler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/52] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Mercedesstrasse 137 70327 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/06] | For all designated states DaimlerChrysler AG Epplestrasse 225 70567 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEUBERGER, Axel Römerstrasse 27 72218 Wildberg / DE | 02 /
IZQUIERDO, Patrick Cartesiusstrasse 79/1 89075 Ulm / DE | 03 /
PELLKOFFER, Wolfgang Baumteilweg 19 91567 Herrieden / DE | 04 /
PFEFFINGER, Harald Moerikestrasse 7 75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | 05 /
SASS, Heiko Rosenstrasse 35 71732 Tamm / DE | [2007/06] | Application number, filing date | 05742885.6 | 21.05.2005 | [2007/06] | WO2005EP05529 | Priority number, date | DE20041025553 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025553 | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005115658 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1748856 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748856 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B21D53/84, F01L1/047, F16H53/02 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
F16H53/025 (EP);
B21D53/845 (EP);
F01L1/047 (EP);
F01L2301/00 (EP);
F01L2303/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE [2007/35] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NOCKENWELLE UND EIN VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2007/06] | English: | CAMSHAFT AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2007/06] | French: | ARBRE A CAMES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION | [2007/06] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 01.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 26.11.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.03.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 13.03.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]DE10244151 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * figure - * * page 3 *; | [X]DE29519523U (ECKEL GMBH & CO KG HEINRICH [DE]) [X] 1,5 * page 6 * * figures 1,2 *; | [X]DE19907258 (SAECHSISCHE ELEKTRONENSTRAHL G [DE]) [X] 1,5 * figure - * * abstract * * column 3 *; | [X]DE3342316 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1,5 * abstract * * figure - * * claims 3,4 * * page 5 *; | [X]DE20121375U (SALZGITTER ANTRIEBSTECHNIK GMB [DE]) [X] 1,2 * figure - * * abstract * * page 6 *; | [X]DE19909184 (SAECHSISCHE ELEKTRONENSTRAHL G [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X]GB2187405 (GKN TECHNOLOGY LTD) [X] 1 * abstract * * figures 3,4 *; | [X]DE19617219 (DAIMLER BENZ AG [DE]) [X] 1 * column 3 * * figure - *; | [X]DE19932810 (SAECHSISCHE ELEKTRONENSTRAHL G [DE]) [X] 1 * abstract * * figure - * |