EP1747219 - MUSCARINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS FIELD OF THE INVENTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.01.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAINE, Dramane, I. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 02 /
McCLELAND, Brent, W. 709 Swedeland Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 03 /
NEIPP, Christopher, E. 709 Swedeland, Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | 04 /
PALOVICH, Michael, R. 709 Swedeland, Road King of Prussia, PA 19406 / US | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Florence, Julia Anne, et al GlaxoSmithKline Global Patents (CN925.1) 980 Great West Road Brentford, Middlesex TW8 9GS / GB | [N/P] | Application number, filing date | 05742935.9 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005US16148 | Priority number, date | US20040570581P | 13.05.2004 Original published format: US 570581 P | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005112644 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1747219 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 30.03.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C07D453/02, A61K31/44 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
C07D453/02 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | 07.12.2006 | LV | 07.12.2006 | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTAGONISTEN DES MUSCARINISCHEN ACETYLCHOLINREZEPTORS | [2007/05] | English: | MUSCARINIC ACETYLCHOLINE RECEPTOR ANTAGONISTS FIELD OF THE INVENTION | [2007/05] | French: | DOMAINE DE L'INVENTION ANTAGONISTES RÉCEPTEURS D'ACÉTYLE CHOLINE MUSCARINIQUE | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 21.08.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/08] | 28.09.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6281226 (BERRY VALERIE [US], et al) [A] 1-12* example 24 *; | [E]WO2005118594 (GLAXO GROUP LTD [GB], et al) [E] 1-3 * claim 2 * | International search | [Y]FI56182B (ORION YHTYMAE OY [FI]); | [A]EP0479481 (MERCK & CO INC [US]); | [A]WO9710222 (CORTECH INC [US]); | [A]US5681841 (HIMMELSBACH FRANK [DE], et al) |