EP1743073 - MOVABLE MACHINE FOR JETTING A LIQUID JET, FOR EXAMPLE PAINT ON A FIXED HORIZONTAL SURFACE FOR FORMING A LINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.03.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 02.11.2011 [2011/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morisse, Philippe Le Village 32200 Giscaro / FR | [2007/03] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/03] | Representative(s) | Ravina, Bernard, et al Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse 31700 Blagnac / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/42] | Ravina, Bernard, et al Ravina S.A. 8, rue des Briquetiers Z.A. de Font Grasse 31700 Blagnac / FR | ||
Former [2007/03] | Ravina, Bernard, et al Ravina SA, 8, rue des Briquetiers, BP 10077, ZA de Font Grasse 31703 Blagnac Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 05742938.3 | 31.03.2005 | [2007/03] | WO2005EP51465 | Priority number, date | FR20040003936 | 15.04.2004 Original published format: FR 0403936 | [2007/03] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005111309 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | FR | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1743073 | Date: | 17.01.2007 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1743073 | Date: | 14.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E01C23/22 | [2007/03] | CPC: |
A63C19/08 (EP);
E01C23/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/03] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEWEGLICHE MASCHINE ZUM SPRITZEN EINES FLÜSSIGKEITSSTRAHLS, BEISPIELSWEISE FARBE, AUF EINE FESTSTEHENDE HORIZONTALE FLÄCHE ZUR BILDUNG EINER LINIE | [2007/03] | English: | MOVABLE MACHINE FOR JETTING A LIQUID JET, FOR EXAMPLE PAINT ON A FIXED HORIZONTAL SURFACE FOR FORMING A LINE | [2007/03] | French: | MACHINE MOBILE POUR PROJETER SUR UNE SURFACE HORIZONTALE FIXE UN JET DE LIQUIDE PAR EXEMPLE DE LA PEINTURE EN VUE DE LA FORMATION D'UNE LIGNE. | [2007/03] | Entry into regional phase | 26.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 26.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/03] | 17.09.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 17.02.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2009/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 14.05.2008 | CY | 14.05.2008 | CZ | 14.05.2008 | DK | 14.05.2008 | EE | 14.05.2008 | FI | 14.05.2008 | IE | 14.05.2008 | LT | 14.05.2008 | NL | 14.05.2008 | PL | 14.05.2008 | RO | 14.05.2008 | SI | 14.05.2008 | SK | 14.05.2008 | TR | 14.05.2008 | BG | 14.08.2008 | SE | 14.08.2008 | GR | 15.08.2008 | ES | 25.08.2008 | IS | 14.09.2008 | PT | 14.10.2008 | HU | 15.11.2008 | [2011/43] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
HU | 15.11.2008 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
GR | 15.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
BG | 14.08.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
EE | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/14] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
RO | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
PT | 14.10.2008 | ||
Former [2009/13] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
CZ | 14.05.2008 | ||
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
LT | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SK | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/08] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
DK | 14.05.2008 | ||
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
IE | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/07] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
SE | 14.08.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2009/05] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
IS | 14.09.2008 | ||
Former [2008/50] | AT | 14.05.2008 | |
FI | 14.05.2008 | ||
NL | 14.05.2008 | ||
PL | 14.05.2008 | ||
SI | 14.05.2008 | ||
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | SI | 14.05.2008 | |
ES | 25.08.2008 | ||
Former [2008/44] | SI | 14.05.2008 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE2710013 (HOFMANN WALTER) [A] 1 * page 2, line 10 - page 3, line 6; figure 1 *; | [AD]EP0302037 (TRAFIK OCH FRITID AB [SE]) [AD] 1-18 * column 3, line 6 - column 4, line 55; figure 1 *; | [A]GB2257473 (SUPATURF PROD LTD [GB]) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]DE9301759U (DURI TOBIAS, GASS KARL-HEINZ) [A] 1 * page 5, line 12 - page 6, line 17; figures 1-4 * |