EP1745189 - HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH HOLLOW-AXLE HINGE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/04] | HOLLOW-AXLE HINGE | ||
[2014/09] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.08.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU | published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2015/13] |
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Str. 34 81739 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAAB, Alfred Oberlengenfeld 2 73460 Hüttlingen / DE | [2007/04] | Application number, filing date | 05742995.3 | 29.04.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005EP51963 | Priority number, date | DE2000240070U | 04.05.2004 Original published format: DE 20040070 U | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005108725 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745189 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745189 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05D11/00 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
E05D11/0081 (EP);
E05D7/081 (EP);
E05Y2900/31 (EP);
F16C33/20 (EP);
F25D23/028 (EP);
F25D2323/024 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | HAUSHALTGERÄT MIT HOHLACHSIGEM SCHARNIER | [2014/09] | English: | HOUSEHOLD APPLIANCE WITH HOLLOW-AXLE HINGE | [2014/09] | French: | APPAREIL MENAGER AVEC CHARNIERE A AXE CREUX | [2014/09] |
Former [2007/04] | HOHLACHSIGES SCHARNIER | ||
Former [2007/04] | HOLLOW-AXLE HINGE | ||
Former [2007/04] | CHARNIERE A AXE CREUX | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 07.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 15.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 03.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 02.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 29.04.2005 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2017/39] |
Former [2016/01] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE29918401U (DETTLAFF ULRIKE [DE]) [X] 1,2,8,9 * pages 1,2; figures 1,2; claims 1-8 * [A] 2-7; | [X]US2522989 (CARBARY RICHARD J) [X] 1,2,8,9 * column 1, lines 1-20 * * column 1, line 47 - column 4, line 74; figures 1-8; claims 1-5 *; | [PX]WO2004048730 (MULTIBRAS ELETRODOMESTICOS SA [BR], et al) [PX] 1,2,8,9 * page 4, line 11 - page 4, line 16; figures 1-5; claim 1 *; | [A]US6192630 (BANICEVIC NEDO [CA], et al) [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | Examination | JP2001272162 | by applicant | WO2004048730 | JP2001272162 |