EP1772508 - DISPLAY UNIT-USE BLUE LIGHT EMITTING FLUORESCENT SUBSTANCE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR AND FIELD EMISSION TYPE DISPLAY UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.02.2008 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.02.2008 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.03.2008 [2008/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | For all designated states Kabushi Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YOKOSAWA, Nobuyuki, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1058001 / JP | 02 /
YAMAGUCHI, Kenichi, c/o Intellectual Property Div. Toshiba Corp., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1058001 / JP | 03 /
ONO, Yuuki, c/o Intellectual Property Division To shiba Corp., , 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1058001 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Takeo, c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corp., 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1058001 / JP | [2007/15] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/15] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05743174.4 | 26.05.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005JP09687 | Priority number, date | JP20040171008 | 09.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004171008 | [2007/15] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005121275 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1772508 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/56, C09K11/08, H01J31/12 | [2007/15] | CPC: |
H01J31/127 (EP,US);
C09K11/642 (EP,US);
C09K11/7789 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/15] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BILDSCHIRMEINHEITSTAUGLICHE BLAULICHT EMITTIERENDE FLUORESZIERENDE SUBSTANZ UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR SOWIE FELDEMISSIONSARTIGE BILDSCHIRMEINHEIT | [2007/15] | English: | DISPLAY UNIT-USE BLUE LIGHT EMITTING FLUORESCENT SUBSTANCE AND PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR AND FIELD EMISSION TYPE DISPLAY UNIT | [2007/15] | French: | SUBSTANCE FLUORESCENTE LUMINESCENTE BLEUE POUR UNITÉ D"AFFICHAGE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI ET UNITÉ D"AFFICHAGE DE TYPE ÉMISSION DE CHAMP | [2007/15] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | Translation filed | 21.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 10.01.2007 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 15.02.2007 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, MC, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 13.02.2008 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2008/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002226847 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2002028474 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JPH07305056 (FUTABA DENSHI KOGYO KK); | [XP]JP2005002209 (TOSHIBA CORP) |