EP1738379 - SWITCH CONTACT ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/01] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DEYLITZ, Erhard Forkenzeile 17 13125 Berlin / DE | 02 /
GODESA, Ludvik Eisenacher Str. 115 10777 Berlin / DE | 03 /
HEYDENDORF, Jürgen Klingenbergstr. 8 16761 Hennigsdorf / DE | 04 /
HOHENBERGER, Ralph Rotkehlchenstr. 4 14656 Brieselang / DE | 05 /
TÜRKMEN, Sezai Schuckertdamm 334 13629 Berlin / DE | [2007/01] | Application number, filing date | 05743399.7 | 22.04.2005 | [2007/01] | WO2005DE00770 | Priority number, date | DE20041020654 | 22.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004020654 | [2007/01] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005104154 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1738379 | Date: | 03.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H01H1/22 | [2007/01] | CPC: |
H01H1/226 (EP,US);
H01H2001/228 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/31] |
Former [2007/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHALTKONTAKTANORDNUNG | [2007/01] | English: | SWITCH CONTACT ARRANGEMENT | [2007/01] | French: | ENSEMBLE CONTACTS DE COMMUTATION | [2007/01] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/01] | 06.05.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0219449 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * | by applicant | DE10048660 | EP0727805 | EP0955658 | EP0219449 | EP1218898 |