EP1775817 - ELECTRIC JUNCTION BOX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sumitomo Wiring Systems, Ltd. 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2007/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAYAKAWA, Tatsuya, SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | 02 /
OKA, Tatsuya, SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS, LTD 1-14, Nishisuehiro-cho Yokkaichi-shi, Mie 510-8503 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Uchida, Kenji, et al Fédit-Loriot 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Uchida, Kenji, et al S.A. Fedit-Loriot et Autres Conseils en Propriété Industrielle 38, avenue Hoche 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 05743629.7 | 24.05.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP09406 | Priority number, date | JP20040206211 | 13.07.2004 Original published format: JP 2004206211 | [2007/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006006304 | Date: | 19.01.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775817 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.01.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 19.01.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/16 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H05K7/026 (EP,US);
H01R9/2425 (EP,US);
H01R9/2466 (EP,US);
H05K1/144 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10189 (EP,US);
H05K2201/10303 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/42] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHE VERTEILERDOSE | [2007/16] | English: | ELECTRIC JUNCTION BOX | [2007/16] | French: | BORNIER ÉLECTRIQUE | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2007 | Translation filed | 13.02.2007 | National basic fee paid | 13.02.2007 | Search fee paid | 13.02.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.02.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.05.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 13.02.2007 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 01.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/21] | 17.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2016 | 12   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2001313132 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS); | [Y]JP2003009347 (SUMITOMO WIRING SYSTEMS) |