EP1753060 - FUEL RESERVOIR FOR FUEL CELL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.01.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.04.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.05.2018 [2018/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PENCIL Co., Ltd. 23-37, Higashi Ohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8537 / JP | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Honmachi 1-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | [2007/36] |
Former [2007/25] | For all designated states CASIO COMPUTER CO., LTD. 6-2, Honmachi 1-chome, Shibuya-ku Tokyo 151-8543 / JP | ||
Former [2007/07] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI PENCIL Co., Ltd. 23-37, Higashi Ohi 5-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-8537 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OSADA, Takahiro c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO., LTD., Gunma Factory, 10 91, Tatsuishi, Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375850 / JP | 02 /
SUDA, Yoshihisa c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO., LTD., Gunma Factory, 10 91, Tatsuishi, Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375850 / JP | 03 /
KAMITANI, Toshimi c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO., LTD., Gunma Factory, 10 91, Tatsuishi, Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375850 / JP | 04 /
YAMADA, Kunitaka c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO., LTD., Gunma Factory, 10 91, Tatsuishi, Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375850 / JP | 05 /
NISHIMURA, Kouji c/o MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO., LTD., Gunma Factory, 10 91, Tatsuishi, Fujioka-shi, Gunma 375850 / JP | 06 /
Kabasawa, Yasunari, c/o Casio Computer Co., Ltd. Hamura R & D Center, 2-1, Sakae-cho 3-chome Hamura-shai, Tokyo 2058555 / JP | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Oppermann, Frank, et al OANDO Oppermann & Oppermann Wilhelminenstrasse 1a 65193 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/14] | Oppermann, Frank, et al Oppermann & Oppermann LLP John-F.-Kennedy-Straße 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2007/07] | Oppermann, Frank Luderschmidt, Schüler & Partner Patentanwälte John-F-Kennedy-Strasse 4 65189 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 05743823.6 | 26.05.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005JP09661 | Priority number, date | JP20040158050 | 27.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004158050 | [2007/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117184 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1753060 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 08.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/04 | [2009/03] | CPC: |
H01M8/04208 (EP,US);
H01M8/04 (KR);
H01M8/04186 (EP,US);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/06 (KR);
H01M8/1011 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/07] | H01M8/04, H01M8/06 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/36] |
Former [2007/07] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BRENNSTOFFRESERVOIR FÜR EINE BRENNSTOFFZELLE | [2007/07] | English: | FUEL RESERVOIR FOR FUEL CELL | [2007/07] | French: | RESERVOIR A COMBUSTIBLE POUR PILE A COMBUSTIBLE | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2006 | Translation filed | 02.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/20] | 11.01.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.04.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 21.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2017 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1087455 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,2,12-14 * paragraphs [0019] , [0055] , [0063] * * figures 12,18 * [Y] 3,9-11; | [Y]US2004033146 (DAI XUNHU [US], et al) [Y] 3,9-11 * paragraphs [0015] , [0018] , [0019] * * claims 3,8 *; | [PX]WO2005031903 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD [JP], et al) [PX] 1-3,9-11 * page 15, line 22 - page 16, line 11 * * page 22, lines 3-20 ** figures 6,8 * | International search | [XP]JP2004247136 (NEC CORP); | [XP]JP2005038803 (TOKAI CORP); | [XP]JP2005032598 (SONY CORP); | [XE]JP2005228663 (TOKAI CORP); | [A]JP2004063200 (MITSUBISHI PENCIL CO); | [A]JP2001093551 (TOSHIBA CORP) |