EP1754869 - THERMOSTAT DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.02.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 17.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2018 [2018/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nippon Thermostat Co., Ltd. 59-2 Nakazato 6-chome Kiyose-shi Tokyo 204-0003 / JP | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
INOUE, Fujio, c/o NIPPON THERMOSTAT CO., LTD 59-2, Nakazato 6-chome Kiyose-shi, Tokyo 2040003 / JP | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Jannig, Peter, et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte PartG mbB Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/16] | Jannig, Peter, et al Jannig & Repkow Patentanwälte Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | Jannig, Peter, et al Jannig & Repkow, Patentanwälte, Klausenberg 20 86199 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 05744125.5 | 17.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005JP08956 | Priority number, date | JP20040151128 | 21.05.2004 Original published format: JP 2004151128 | [2007/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005113958 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754869 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754869 | Date: | 19.04.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F01P7/16, F16K31/68 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
G05D23/022 (EP,US);
F01P2070/00 (EP,US);
F01P7/16 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2017/16] |
Former [2007/35] | DE, GB | ||
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | THERMOSTATVORRICHTUNG | [2007/08] | English: | THERMOSTAT DEVICE | [2007/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE THERMOSTAT | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 01.02.2006 | Translation filed | 01.02.2006 | National basic fee paid | 01.02.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 11.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.09.2012 | Opposition(s) | 22.01.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 13.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 26.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB1073412 (GULDE REGELARMATUREN VERWALTUN) [X] 1 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]US3640454 (FREISMUTH JOHN S, et al) [A] 1* figure 3 *; | [X]DE3130475 (HERPERS HUBERT) [X] 1,4 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE8801797U (BEHR-THOMSON DEHNSTOFFREGLER GMBH & CO, 7014 KORNWESTHEIM, DE) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [X]US5038724 (NEAL LOUIS R [US], et al) [X] 1 * figures 2-5 *; | [X]GB2280729 (BEHR THOMSON DEHNSTOFFREGLER [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 *; | [X]DE19646933 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * figure 2 *; | [X]EP1207283 (NIPPON THERMOSTAT KK [JP]) [X] 1-3 * figures 5,7 *; | [X]DE10207036 (FISHMAN JOSEPH [CA], et al) [X] 1-4 * figures 2,4,6 *; | [PX]DE102004009713 (AISIN SEIKI [JP], et al) [PX] 1-4 * figures 4,5 * | International search | [Y]JPS6065215 (BEERU TOMUSON DEENSHIYUTOTSUFU); | [Y]JPH0250125U ; | [Y]JPH0338474U ; | [Y]JPH0380176U | by applicant | GB1073412 | DE3130475 | DE8801797U | US5038724 | GB2280729 | DE19646933 | EP1207283 | DE10207036 |