EP1754058 - Method for determining the amount of circulating CD36 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/08] | METHOD OF EVALUATION OF THE RELATIVE RISK OF DEVELOPING ATHEROSCLEROSIS IN PATIENTS | ||
[2015/21] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Region Nordjylland Niels Bohrs Vej 30 9220 Aalborg Øst / DK | [2013/13] |
Former [2007/08] | For all designated states Atherocheck APS c/o Ostjysk Innovation A/S Gustav Wieds Vej 10 8000 Arthus C / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Handberg, Aase Permelillevej 15 8240 Risskov / DK | [2013/13] |
Former [2007/08] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Høiberg A/S St. Kongensgade 59 A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | ||
Former [2007/08] | HOEIBERG A/S European Patent & Trademark Attorneys Store Kongensgade 59A 1264 Copenhagen K / DK | Application number, filing date | 05744476.2 | 26.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005DK00352 | Priority number, date | DK20040000829 | 26.05.2004 Original published format: DK 200400829 | DK20040001222 | 13.08.2004 Original published format: DK 200401222 | US20040601123P | 13.08.2004 Original published format: US 601123 P | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005116644 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754058 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754058 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.12.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/68 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
G01N33/6893 (EP);
G01N2333/70596 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2007/08] | G01N33/50 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2007/08] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | 21.06.2007 | BA | 21.06.2007 | HR | 21.06.2007 | LV | 21.06.2007 | MK | 21.06.2007 | YU | 21.06.2007 | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Bestimmung der Menge von zirkulierendem CD36 | [2015/21] | English: | Method for determining the amount of circulating CD36 | [2015/21] | French: | Procédé pour déterminer la quantité de CD36 circulant | [2015/21] |
Former [2007/08] | VERFAHREN ZUR BEURTEILUNG DES RELATIVEN RISIKOS DER ENTWICKLUNG VON ATHEROSKLEROSE IN PATIENTEN | ||
Former [2007/08] | METHOD OF EVALUATION OF THE RELATIVE RISK OF DEVELOPING ATHEROSCLEROSIS IN PATIENTS | ||
Former [2007/08] | PROCEDE POUR EVALUER LE RISQUE RELATIF DE DEVELOPPEMENT DE L'ATHEROSCLEROSE CHEZ DES PATIENTS | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.06.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.06.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.02.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2007 | Examination requested [2007/31] | 12.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.11.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 31.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.12.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.09.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 28.09.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 28.09.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.08.2008 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 31.01.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 31.01.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 08.02.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 01.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 06.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 12.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 26.05.2005 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | LU | 26.05.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 26.05.2005 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 26.05.2005 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LU | 26.05.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 26.05.2005 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 31.05.2016 | ||
Former [2016/37] | BE | 31.05.2016 | Cited in | International search | [XY]JP2000180447 ; | [XY]JP2001056338 ; | [A]WO2004017986 (UNIV MONTREAL [CA], et al) [A] 9-14,9-14,9-14 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]WO0136675 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 9-14,9-14,9-14 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document *; | [A]US6322976 (AITMAN TIMOTHY J [GB], et al) [A] 9-14,9-14,9-14 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20001013), vol. 2000, no. 09, & JP2000180447 A 20000630 (DAINIPPON PHARMACEUT CO LTD) [X] 1-4,7,8,1-4,7,8,1-4,7,8 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * [Y] 5,6,15,5,6,15,5,6,15 | [XY] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20010605), vol. 2000, no. 19, & JP2001056338 A 20010227 (TOKYOTO IGAKU KENKYU KIKO; KASANUKI HIROSHI; IATRON LAB INC) [X] 1-4,1-4,1-4 * abstract * * abstract * * abstract * [Y] 5,6,15,5,6,15,5,6,15 | [AY] - PELSERS M M A L ET AL, "A sensitive immunoassay for rat fatty acid translocase (CD36) using phage antibodies selected on cell transfectants: Abundant presence of fatty acid translocase/CD36 in cardiac and red skeletal muscle and up-regulation in diabetes", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, PORTLAND PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19990201), vol. 337, no. 3, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 407 - 414, XP002341307 [A] 9-14,9-14,9-14 * the whole document * * the whole document * * the whole document * [Y] 5,6,15,5,6,15,5,6,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/0264-6021:3370407 |