EP1748730 - X-RAY APPARATUS, EXPECIALLY MOMMOGRAPHIC X-RAY APPARATUS, COMPRISING INDICATING MEANS IN THE FORM OF LEDS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/06] | X-RAY APPARATUS, EXPECIALLY MOMMOGRPHIC X-RAY APPARATUS, COMPRISING INIDCATING MEANS IN THE FORM OF LEDS | ||
[2010/41] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Postfach 22 16 34 80506 München / DE | [2007/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BRANDSTÄTTER, Werner Obere Dorfstr. 8A 90427 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
RAMSAUER, Martin Espanstrasse 16 90602 Pyrbaum / DE | [2007/06] | Application number, filing date | 05744915.9 | 04.05.2005 | [2007/06] | WO2005EP52047 | Priority number, date | DE20041023046 | 11.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004023046 | [2007/06] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005110233 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1748730 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1748730 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61B6/08, A61B6/00 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
A61B6/08 (EP,US);
A61B6/502 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FI [2007/33] |
Former [2007/06] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | RÖNTGENEINRICHTUNG, INSBESONDERE MAMMOGRAPHIE-RÖNTGENEINRICHTUNG, MIT INDIKATORMITTELN IN FORM VON LEDS | [2007/06] | English: | X-RAY APPARATUS, EXPECIALLY MOMMOGRAPHIC X-RAY APPARATUS, COMPRISING INDICATING MEANS IN THE FORM OF LEDS | [2010/41] | French: | DISPOSITIF A RAYONS X, EN PARTICULIER DISPOSITIF DE MAMMOGRAPHIE AUX RAYONS X, COMPRENANT DES MOYENS D'INDICATIONS SOUS LA FORME DE LED | [2007/06] |
Former [2007/06] | X-RAY APPARATUS, EXPECIALLY MOMMOGRPHIC X-RAY APPARATUS, COMPRISING INIDCATING MEANS IN THE FORM OF LEDS | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2006 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.08.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 23.09.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 20.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4825455 (BAUER MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, lines 55-61 *; | [A]US5563924 (WINKELMANN HELMUT [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, lines 27-60 *; | [A]EP0819407 (YOKOGAWA MEDICAL SYST [JP]) [A] 1-6 * column 4, line 26 - column 5, line 37; figures 3,4 *; | [A]US6036362 (SCHMITT THOMAS [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** column 2, lines 12-55 *; | [A]US6104778 (MURAD SIMON WILLIAM [GB]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, lines 23-55 *; | [DA]DE19943898 (PHILIPS CORP INTELLECTUAL PTY [DE]) [DA] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 28 - column 3, line 13 *; | [A]US6305842 (KUNERT HEINZ-PETER [DE]) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 30 * |