EP1853924 - A METHOD FOR MEASURING PROINSULIN AND C-PEPTIDE AND A KIT THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.05.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VRIJE UNIVERSITEIT BRUSSEL Pleinlaan 2 1050 Brussel / BE | For all designated states OPUS NV Benedenstraat 5 1761 Borchtlombeek / BE | [2007/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE PAUW, Pieter Keierberg 20 B-1730 Asse / BE | [2007/46] | Representative(s) | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/46] | Brants, Johan P.E., et al De Clercq, Brants & Partners cv Edgard Gevaertdreef 10a 9830 Sint-Martens-Latem / BE | Application number, filing date | 05744943.1 | 27.01.2005 | [2007/46] | WO2005EP00785 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006079354 | Date: | 03.08.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/31] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1853924 | Date: | 14.11.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.08.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/46] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1853924 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.08.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/74 | [2007/46] | CPC: |
G01N33/74 (EP,US);
G01N2333/62 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/46] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR MESSUNG VON PROINSULIN UND C-PEPTID SOWIE KIT DAFÜR | [2007/46] | English: | A METHOD FOR MEASURING PROINSULIN AND C-PEPTIDE AND A KIT THEREFOR | [2007/46] | French: | METHODE DE MESURE DE LA PROINSULINE ET D'UN PEPTIDE C ET KIT CORRESPONDANT | [2007/46] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2007 | National basic fee paid | 24.08.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.08.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.08.2007 | Examination requested [2007/46] | 08.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.09.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.01.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.02.2008 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 22.07.2009 | BE | 22.07.2009 | CY | 22.07.2009 | CZ | 22.07.2009 | DK | 22.07.2009 | EE | 22.07.2009 | FI | 22.07.2009 | IT | 22.07.2009 | LT | 22.07.2009 | NL | 22.07.2009 | PL | 22.07.2009 | RO | 22.07.2009 | SE | 22.07.2009 | SI | 22.07.2009 | SK | 22.07.2009 | TR | 22.07.2009 | BG | 22.10.2009 | GR | 23.10.2009 | ES | 02.11.2009 | IS | 22.11.2009 | PT | 22.11.2009 | HU | 23.01.2010 | IE | 27.01.2010 | LU | 27.01.2010 | MC | 31.01.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/43] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CY | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
LU | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CY | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
HU | 23.01.2010 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CY | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
IT | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/07] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
IE | 27.01.2010 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
GR | 23.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/39] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
MC | 31.01.2010 | ||
Former [2010/25] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
BE | 22.07.2009 | ||
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/24] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
CZ | 22.07.2009 | ||
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
RO | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
SK | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/20] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
DK | 22.07.2009 | ||
EE | 22.07.2009 | ||
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/17] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
BG | 22.10.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | ||
PT | 22.11.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 22.07.2009 | |
FI | 22.07.2009 | ||
LT | 22.07.2009 | ||
NL | 22.07.2009 | ||
PL | 22.07.2009 | ||
SE | 22.07.2009 | ||
SI | 22.07.2009 | ||
ES | 02.11.2009 | ||
IS | 22.11.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0484961 (TOSOH CORP [JP]) [A] 1-40 * example 1; claims 1-7 *; | [A]WO9859246 (PASTEUR SANOFI DIAGNOSTICS [FR], et al) [A] 1-40 * claims 1-11 * * example 1 *; | [A]EP1191337 (FUJIREBIO KK [JP]) [A] 1-40 * examples 1,6; claims 1-15 *; | [AD] - RODER M E ET AL, "Disproportionately elevated proinsulin levels precede the onset of insulin-dependent diabetes mellitus in siblings with low first phase insulin responses. The Childhood Diabetes in Finland Study Group.", THE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM. DEC 1994, (199412), vol. 79, no. 6, ISSN 0021-972X, pages 1570 - 1575, XP002349998 [AD] 1-40 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1210/jc.79.6.1570 | [A] - SASAKUMA F ET AL, "[A method for determination of proinsulin levels in serum using both insolubilized anti-insulin antibody and anti-C-peptide antibody]", RINSHO BYORI. THE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY. JUL 1992, (199207), vol. 40, no. 7, ISSN 0047-1860, pages 769 - 774, XP008053759 [A] 1-40 * abstract * | [A] - ZILKER T R ET AL, "Determination of proinsulin intermediates by means of an immunoradiometric method using polyclonal antibodies", HORMONE AND METABOLIC RESEARCH 1988 GERMANY, (1988), vol. 18, no. SUPPL., ISSN 0018-5043, pages 48 - 55, XP008053752 [A] 1-40 * page 51, column 2, paragraph 3 - page 52, column 1, paragraph 1 * | [A] - SASAKUMA F ET AL, "[An improved method for determination of C-peptide levels in serum: pretreatment of test samples with anti-insulin antibody insolubilized with magnetic particles]", RINSHO BYORI. THE JAPANESE JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PATHOLOGY. FEB 1994, (199402), vol. 42, no. 2, ISSN 0047-1860, pages 183 - 188, XP008053760 [A] 1-40 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1191337 | - RODER ET AL., J CLIN ENDOCRINOL METAB, (1994), vol. 79, no. 6, pages 1570 - 5 | - ZILKER ET AL., HORM METAB RES SUPPL, (1988), vol. 18, pages 48 - 55 |