EP1745601 - INDEPENDENT MODE SELECTION FOR FORWARD AND REVERSE LINKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.11.2011 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.12.2011 [2011/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OZLUTURK, Fatih, M. 70 Willowdale Avenue Port Washington, New York 11050 / US | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Pierrou, Mattias, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/37] | Pierrou, Mattias, et al Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Pierrou, Mattias Awapatent AB, P.O. Box 45 086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 05745143.7 | 02.05.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005US14704 | Priority number, date | US20040570567P | 13.05.2004 Original published format: US 570567 P | US20040000286 | 30.11.2004 Original published format: US 286 | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005115020 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1745601 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.09.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.05.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H04W88/06, // H04W76/02 | [2011/07] | CPC: |
H04W88/06 (EP,KR,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,KR,US);
H04W24/02 (KR);
H04W84/12 (KR)
|
Former IPC [2007/04] | H04L12/28, H04L12/66, H04M11/04, H04N7/173, G06F7/00, G06F15/16, H04J3/26 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | UNABHÄNGIGE MODUSAUSWAHL FÜR VORWÄRTS- UND RÜCKWÄRTSSTRECKEN | [2007/04] | English: | INDEPENDENT MODE SELECTION FOR FORWARD AND REVERSE LINKS | [2007/04] | French: | SELECTION DE MODE INDEPENDANTE POUR DES LIAISONS AVAL ET POUR DES LIAISONS INVERSES | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 14.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 14.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 14.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.07.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/50] | 27.07.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2011/50] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9857482 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [X] 1-4,7,8,11-14,17,18 * page 2, lines 6-16 * * page 4, lines 16-28 * * page 7, line 15 - page 9, line 19 *; | [A]GB2330729 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-20* page 2, line 30 - page 3, line 14 *; | [X]WO0213462 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [X] 1-20 * page 1, lines 19-22 * * page 7, lines 22-32 * * page 11, lines 10-23 *; | [A]US2003118015 (GUNNARSSON MAGNUS [US], et al) [A] 5,6,9,10,15,16,19,20 * paragraphs [0027] , [0028] *; | [X] - TH LAUTERBACH ET AL, "Using DAB and GSM to provide interactive multimedia services to portable andmobile terminals", LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE, SPRINGER VERLAG, BERLIN, DE, (19970521), vol. 1242, ISSN 0302-9743, pages 593 - 607, XP007901490 [X] 1-4,7,8,11-14,17,18 * paragraphs [02.2] , [02.3] , [3.3.1] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BFb0031598 | International search | [A]US5867764 (WILLIAMS THOMAS H [US]); | [A]US2005149531 (SRIVASTAVA SUNIL K [US]); | [A]US2005157750 (RABIE SAMEH [CA], et al); | [A]US2005169279 (MAGD OSAMA A [CA], et al); | [A]US2005288046 (ZHAO WEI [US], et al); | [A]US6993476 (DUTTA RABINDRANATH [US], et al) | by applicant | WO0213462 |