EP1755625 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS USING SAME FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.11.2009 [2009/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Future Products Management S.A. Ankara Building 24 De Castro Street Wickhams Cay I, Road Town Tortola / VG | [2007/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GORBAN, Meir Via Passo Del Turchino 74 3/a I-00139 Rome / IT | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | [N/P] |
Former [2008/45] | Machtalère, Georges, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. 55, rue des Bruyères 1274 Howald / LU | ||
Former [2007/09] | Schmitz, Jean-Marie, et al Dennemeyer & Associates S.A. P.O. Box 1502 1015 Luxembourg / LU | Application number, filing date | 05745209.6 | 01.06.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005IL00573 | Priority number, date | IL20040162288 | 01.06.2004 Original published format: IL 16228804 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117924 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1755625 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/00 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
A61K31/355 (EP,US);
A61K31/375 (EP,US);
A61K36/16 (EP,US);
A61K36/185 (EP,US);
A61K36/254 (EP,US);
A61K36/258 (EP,US);
A61K36/28 (EP,US);
A61K36/38 (EP,US);
A61K36/45 (EP,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,US);
A61K36/896 (EP,US);
A61K36/8962 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/04 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/355, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/375, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/16, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/185, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K36/254, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/258, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/28, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/38, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/45, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ANWENDUNGSVERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON NEURODEGENERATIVEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2007/09] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS USING SAME FOR TREATING NEURODEGENERATIVE DISORDERS | [2007/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCEDES LES UTILISANT DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE TROUBLES NEURODEGENERATIFS | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 07.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.05.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/46] | 23.06.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2002146463 (CLAYTON PAUL [GB]) [X] 1-6,8-10,14-20 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0048] * * claims 17-20,29-33 *; | [X]US6649195 (GORSEK WAYNE F [US]) [X] 1-20 * abstract * * column 1, line 35 - line 50 * * column 2 *; | [A] - HEAD K A, "NATURAL THERAPIES FOR OCULAR DISORDERS, PART ONE: DISEASE OF THE RETINA", ALTERNATIVE MEDICINE REVIEW, THORNE RESEARCH INC., SANDPOINT,, US, (199910), vol. 4, no. 5, ISSN 1089-5159, pages 342 - 359, XP009007572 | [A] - MELETIS C D ET AL, "NATURAL THERAPIES TO PRESERVE AND ENHANCE COGNITION AND MEMORY", ALTERNATIVE AND COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES, MARY ANN LIEBERT, LARCHMONT, NY, US, (2001), vol. 7, no. 5, ISSN 1076-2809, pages 273 - 276, XP009029509 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1089/107628001753312103 |