EP1766393 - MHC BRIDGING SYSTEM FOR DETECTING CTL-MEDIATED LYSIS OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.06.2010 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.07.2010 [2010/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, CA 92821 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2010/26] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 250 S. Kraemer Boulevard Brea, 92821 CA / US | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states Beckman Coulter, Inc. 4300 N. Harbor Boulevard Fullerton, CA 92834 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NUGENT, C. Thomas, IV 5301 Lodi Street San Diego, CA 92117 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Abhay 12638 Salmon River Road San Diego, CA 92129 / US | 03 /
KUUS-REICHEL, Kristine 5047 Litchfield Road San Diego, CA 92116 / US | [2007/13] | Representative(s) | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Cornish, Kristina Victoria Joy, et al Kilburn & Strode, 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05745499.3 | 05.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005US15637 | Priority number, date | US20040568900P | 07.05.2004 Original published format: US 568900 P | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005111624 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1766393 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.01.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/53, G01N33/567, G01N33/574, C07K16/46, A61K39/395 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
G01N33/502 (EP,US);
G01N33/5011 (EP,US);
G01N33/505 (EP,US);
G01N33/57492 (EP,US);
G01N2333/70539 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MHC-BRÜCKENSYSTEM ZUM NACHWEIS DER CTL-VERMITTELTEN LYSE ANTIGENPRÄSENTIERENDER ZELLEN | [2007/13] | English: | MHC BRIDGING SYSTEM FOR DETECTING CTL-MEDIATED LYSIS OF ANTIGEN PRESENTING CELLS | [2007/13] | French: | SYSTÈME DE FORMATION DE PONT DE COMPLEXES MAJEURS D'HISTOCOMPATIBILITÉ POUR DÉTECTER UNE LYSE MÉDIÉE PAR LES LYMPHOCYTES T DE CELLULES PRÉSENTANT DES ANTIGÈNES | [2009/40] |
Former [2007/13] | SYSTÈME DE FORMATION DE PONT DE COMPLEXES D'HISTOCOMPATIBILITÉ PRINCIPALE POUR DÉTECTER UNE LYSE MÉDIÉE PAR LES LYMPHOCYTES T DE CELLULES PRÉSENTANT DES ANTIGÈNES | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 11.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.09.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.09.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/28] | 26.02.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2010/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO9928748 (ISIS INNOVATION [GB], et al) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9950637 (LUDWIG INST CANCER RES [US], et al) [A] 2,16-25 * example 49 *; | [Y]US2002146746 (NIXON DOUGLAS [US], et al) [Y] 15-17 * paragraphs [0012] , [0036] - [0040] - [0045] , [0055] - [0068] - [0078] - [0081] * * example 1 *; | [XY]US2003044415 (SAVAGE PHILIP MICHAEL [GB]) [X] 8-14,22-25 * paragraphs [0007] - [0029] - [0052] , [0074] - [0084] * * examples 1-3 * * figures 1,3 * * claims 1-19 * * idem * [Y] 1-7,15-17; | [DX] - ROBERT B ET AL, "ANTIBODY-CONJUGATED MHC CLASS I TETRAMERS CAN TARGET TUMOR CELLS FOR SPECIFIC LYSIS BY T LYMPHOCYTES", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, WEINHEIM, DE, (200011), vol. 30, no. 11, ISSN 0014-2980, pages 3165 - 3170, XP001021944 [DX] 8-11,13,14 * paragraphs [02.3] , [04.3] , [04.5] * * figure 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/1521-4141(200011)30:11<3165::AID-IMMU3165>3.0.CO;2-R | [Y] - PASQUIER DU R A ET AL, "LOW FREQUENCY OF CYTOTOXIC T LYMPHOCYTES AGAINST THE NOVEL HLA-A*0201-RESTRICTED JC VIRUS EPITOPE VP1P36 IN PATIENTS WITH PROVEN OR POSSIBLE PROGRESSIVE MULTIFOCAL LEUKOENCEPHALOPATHY", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, THE AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MICROBIOLOGY, US, (200311), vol. 77, no. 22, ISSN 0022-538X, pages 11918 - 11926, XP001181758 [Y] 1-7 * abstract * * page 11919 - page 11920, paragraph "Functional lysis assay" * * page 11921 - page 11922, paragraph "Characterization of the HLA-A*0201-restricted epitope JCV VP1p36" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.77.22.11918-11926.2003 | [A] - MALLET-DESIGNE VALÉRIE I ET AL, "Detection of low-avidity CD4+ T cells using recombinant artificial APC: following the antiovalbumin immune response.", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY (BALTIMORE, MD. : 1950) 1 JAN 2003, (20030101), vol. 170, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 123 - 131, XP002477831 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * | [A] - HERMANS I F ET AL, "The VITAL assay: a versatile fluorometric technique for assessing CTL- and NKT-mediated cytotoxicity against multiple targets in vitro and in vivo", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGICAL METHODS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V.,AMSTERDAM, NL, (20040201), vol. 285, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1759, pages 25 - 40, XP004489663 [A] 1-25 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jim.2003.10.017 | International search | [Y]US2002006903 (SCHNECK JONATHAN [US], et al); | [X]US2003044415 (SAVAGE PHILIP MICHAEL [GB]); | [Y] - CONSTANTIN ET AL, "Major Histocompatibility Complex (MHC) Tetramer Technology: An Evaluation.", BIOLOGICAL RESEARCH FOR NURSING., (200210), vol. 4, no. 2, pages 115 - 127, XP008056732 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1177/1099800402238332 | Examination | - ALTMAN J; ET AL, "Phenotypic analysis of antigen-specific T lymphocytes", SCIENCE, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF SCIENCE, US, WASHINGTON, DC, (19961004), vol. 274, no. 5284, ISSN 0036-8075, pages 94 - 96, XP002135711 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.274.5284.94 | by applicant | US5635363 | US2003044415 | - LECHNER, R ET AL., J. EXP. MED., (2000), vol. 191, pages 1499 - 1512 | - PASQUIER ET AL., JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (2003), vol. 77, pages 11918 - 11926 | - ALTMAN ET AL., SCIENCE, (1996), vol. 274, pages 94 - 96 | - OGG; MCMICHAEL, CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 10, pages 393 - 396 | - BODINIER ET AL., NAT. MED., (2000), vol. 6, pages 707 - 710 | - MCMICHAEL; O'CALLAGHAN, J. EXP. MED., (1998), vol. 187, pages 1367 - 1371 | - HUSE ET AL., SCIENCE, (1989), vol. 246, pages 1275 - 1281 | - WINTER; HARRIS, IMMUNOL. TODAY, (1993), vol. 14, pages 243 - 246 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, pages 544 - 546 | - SHIELDS ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 160, pages 2297 - 2307 | - PEDERSEN ET AL., EUR: J. IMMUNOL., (1995), vol. 25, page 1609 | - EVANS ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1994), page 79 | - GARBOCZI ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, (1992), vol. 89, pages 3429 - 3433 | - FREMONT ET AL., SCIENCE, (1992), vol. 257, page 919 | - KOHLER; MILSTEIN, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, page 495 | - INBAR ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI., USA, vol. 69, page 2659 | - SANDHU, CRIT. REV BIOTECHNOL., (1992), vol. 12, page 437 |