EP1785397 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBONATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.12.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.12.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.01.2015 [2015/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM CORPORATION 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | For all designated states FUJIFILM CORPORATION 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWANO, Tetsuo, c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi Kanagawa 250-01093 / JP | [2007/20] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/20] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05745819.2 | 01.06.2005 | [2007/20] | WO2005JP10071 | Priority number, date | JP20040170456 | 08.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004170456 | [2007/20] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005121024 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1785397 | Date: | 16.05.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C01F11/18, C01G9/00, C01G21/14, C01B31/24 | [2011/49] | CPC: |
C01F11/187 (EP,US);
C01F11/18 (KR);
C01B32/60 (EP,KR,US);
C01F11/181 (EP,US);
C01G21/14 (EP,KR,US);
C01G9/00 (EP,KR,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2004/03 (EP,US);
C01P2004/04 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/20] | C01F11/18, C01G9/00, C01G21/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/20] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON CARBONAT | [2007/20] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARBONATE | [2007/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ SERVANT À PRODUIRE DU CARBONATE | [2007/20] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2007 | Translation filed | 04.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 04.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/20] | 08.05.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.08.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.12.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/05] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]FR1151566 (SYLVANIA ELECTRIC PROD) [X] 1,2,4-6,9 * example - * [I] 3,7,8 | [XI] - L WANG, "Preparation of Uniform Needle-Like Aragonite Particles by Homogeneous Precipitation", JOURNAL OF COLLOID AND INTERFACE SCIENCE, (19991015), vol. 218, no. 2, doi:10.1006/jcis.1999.6463, ISSN 0021-9797, pages 545 - 553, XP055010805 [X] 1-6,9 * the whole document * [I] 7,8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/jcis.1999.6463 | [XI] - SONDI I ET AL, "HOMOGENEOUS PRECIPITATION BY ENZYME-CATALYZED REACTIONS. 2. STRONTIUM AND BARIUM CARBONATES", CHEMISTRY OF MATERIALS, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, WASHINGTON, US, (20030325), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1021/CM020852T, ISSN 0897-4756, pages 1322 - 1326, XP001233345 [X] 1-3,5,9 * the whole document * [I] 4,6-8 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/cm020852t | International search | [X]JPH06318432 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRONICS CORP); | [X]JPS59203728 (EARTH CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JPH06345424 (SAKAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO) |