EP1768473 - MULTILAYER WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2011 [2011/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM CORPORATION 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states FUJIFILM CORPORATION 26-30 Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Koichi, c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577-1, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
KANO, Takeyoshi, c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577-1, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2007/24] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
KAWAMURA, Koichi, c/o FUJIFILM corporation 577-1, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 2588577 / JP | ||
02 /
KANO, Takeyoshi, c/o FUJIFILM corporation 577-1, Ushijima, Kaisei-machi, Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 2588577 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/13] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 D-81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05745977.8 | 31.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005JP09915 | Priority number, date | JP20040163784 | 01.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004163784 | [2007/13] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005120142 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1768473 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 15.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H05K3/46, H05K3/38 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
H05K3/386 (EP,US);
H05K3/381 (EP,US);
H05K3/4652 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1163 (EP,US);
H05K2203/1168 (EP,US);
H05K3/4644 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTIGE LEITERPLATTE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2007/13] | English: | MULTILAYER WIRING BOARD AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING THE SAME | [2007/13] | French: | CARTE IMPRIMÉE EN PLUSIEURS COUCHES ET PROCEDE DE FABRICATION DE LADITE CARTE | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2006 | Translation filed | 22.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 23.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/27] | 02.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2011/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5648201 (DULCEY CHARLES S [US], et al) [Y] 1-9 * column 3, lines 3-19; claim - *; | [Y]US2002102745 (LAHIRI SYAMAL KUMAR [SG], et al) [Y] 1-9 * paragraphs [0043] - [0054]; figure 3; claim - *; | [E]EP0985333 (LINEA TERGI LTD [CY]) [E] 1-9 * paragraph [0012]; claim - *; | [A]WO9834446 (CUPTRONIC AB [SE], et al) [A] 1-9 | International search | [Y]EP1371754 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO [JP]); | [Y]JP2003188498 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD); | [Y]JP2003114525 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD) |