EP1771912 - LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES WITH CHARGE-CUTOFF VOLTAGES OVER 4.35 VOLT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/15] | LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES WITH CHARGE-CUTOFF VOLTAGES OVER 4.35 | ||
[2011/10] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.07.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.08.2012 [2012/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEMICAL LTD. 20, Yoido-dong, Yongdeungpo-ku Seoul 150-010 / KR | [2007/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KIM, Dong-Myung 103-1401, Hwangsil Apartment Wolpyeong-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-280 / KR | 02 /
YOON, Jong-Moon 102-802, Neulpureun Apartment Yongdu-dong, Jung-gu Daejeon 301-110 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Yong-Jeong 111-1108, Sejong Apartment Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | 04 /
CHO, Benjamin 513-802, Samsung 5-cha Apartment Pungdeokcheon 2-dong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-785 / KR | 05 /
JEONG, Jun-Yong 107-408, Hanbat Garden Apartment Sansung-dong Chung-gu Daejeon 301-756 / KR | 06 /
JEONG, Dae-June 557-9 Gwaebeop-dong, Sasang-gu Busan 617-060 / KR | 07 /
BAE, Joon-Sung LG Chemical Development Corp. Munji-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | [2011/38] |
Former [2011/18] | 01 /
KIM, Dong-Myung 103-1401, Hwangsil Apartment Wolpyeong-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-280 / KR | ||
02 /
YOON, Jong-Moon 102-802, Neulpureun Apartment Yongdu-dong, Jung-gu Daejeon 301-110 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Yong-Jeong 111-1108, Sejong Apartment Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | |||
04 /
CHO, Benjamin 513-802, Samsung 5-cha Apartment Pungdeokcheon 2-dong Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 449-785 / KR | |||
05 /
JEONG, Jun-Yong 107-408, Hanbat Garden Apartment Sansung-dong Chung-gu Daejeon 301-756 / KR | |||
06 /
JEONG, Dae-June 557-9 Gwaebeop-dong, Sasang-gu Busan 617-060 / KR | |||
07 /
BAE, Joon-Sung LG Chemical Development Corp. Munji-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | |||
Former [2007/15] | 01 /
KIM, Dong-Myung 103-1401, Hwangsil Apartment Wolpyeong-dong, Seo-gu Daejeon 302-280 / KR | ||
02 /
YOON, Jong-Moon 102-802, Neulpureun Apartment Yongdu-dong, Jung-gu Daejeon 301-110 / KR | |||
03 /
KIM, Yong-Jeong 111-1108, Sejong Apartment Jeonmin-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-390 / KR | |||
04 /
CHO, Benjamin 513-802, Samsung 5-cha Apt Pungdeokcheon 2-dong Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 449-785 / KR | |||
05 /
JEONG, Jun-Yong 107-408, Hanbat Garden Apt. Sansung-dong Chung-gu Daejeon 301-756 / KR | |||
06 /
JEONG, Dae-June 557-9 Gwaebeop-dong, Sasang-gu Busan 617-060 / KR | |||
07 /
BAE, Joon-Sung LG Chemical Development Corp.; Munji-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-380 / KR | Representative(s) | Schreiber, Ina Cabinet Plasseraud ATTENTION : ADDRESS INACTIVE - USE ASS-NR - CDR Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2011/38] | Schreiber, Ina Cabinet Plasseraud 52 rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2007/15] | Schreiber, Ina Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire F-75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 05746061.0 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/15] | WO2005KR01556 | Priority number, date | KR20040038374 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: KR 2004038374 | KR20040116386 | 30.12.2004 Original published format: KR 2004116386 | [2007/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005117195 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1771912 | Date: | 11.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1771912 | Date: | 21.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 08.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.08.2007 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/42, H01M10/052, H01M10/056, H01M4/13, H01M4/02 | [2011/38] | CPC: |
H01M10/42 (EP,US);
H01M10/052 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M10/0567 (EP,US);
H01M10/0569 (EP,US);
H01M4/131 (EP,US);
H01M2004/021 (EP,US);
H01M2010/4292 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (EP,US);
H01M4/485 (EP,US);
H01M4/525 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/15] | H01M10/24 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2007/36] |
Former [2007/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT LADUNGS-CUTOFF-SPANNUNGEN ÜBER 4,35 VOLT | [2011/10] | English: | LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES WITH CHARGE-CUTOFF VOLTAGES OVER 4.35 VOLT | [2011/10] | French: | ACCUMULATEUR AU LITHIUM PRESENTANT DES TENSIONS DE COUPURE DE CHARGE SUPERIEURES A 4,35 VOLT | [2011/10] |
Former [2007/15] | LITHIUM-SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT LADUNGS-CUTOFF-SPANNUNGEN ÜBER 4,35 | ||
Former [2007/15] | LITHIUM SECONDARY BATTERIES WITH CHARGE-CUTOFF VOLTAGES OVER 4.35 | ||
Former [2007/15] | ACCUMULATEUR AU LITHIUM PRESENTANT DES TENSIONS DE COUPURE DE CHARGE SUPERIEURES A 4,35 | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/15] | 18.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.07.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.07.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.01.2008 | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.04.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JPH01304664 (SONY CORP) [Y] 4 * abstract *; | [Y]US5464705 (WAINWRIGHT DAVID [CA]) [Y] 5 * column 4, line 46 - column 5, line 39 *; | [Y]US2001024757 (HWANG DUCK-CHUL [KR], et al) [Y] 7-12 * paragraph [0019]; examples 3,4 *; | [Y]EP1189299 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0042] * * examples 1-4; table 1 *; | [XY]WO03030293 (REN XIAOPING [CN], et al) [X] 1,3 * the whole document * [Y] 7-12; | [XY]EP1324418 (GREATBATCH W TECHNOLOGIES [US]) [X] 1-3 * paragraph [0008] * * paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0031] * [Y] 4-6; | [A]WO2004021502 (TOSHIBA KK [JP], et al) [A] 1,7-12 * the whole document *; | [PX]US2004209156 (REN XIAOPING [CN], et al) [PX] 1,3 * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0051] - paragraph [0052]; examples 5,6,13,16,21,26 *; | [E]US7128998 (SHIMOYAMADA TAKASHI [JP], et al) [E] 1,7-12* column 9, line 32 - column 10, line 44; examples 9,10,12-14 * | International search | [X]US2003113613 (TAKEUCHI ESTHER S [US], et al); | [Y]JP2003249264 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD); | [A]KR20030079736 (NIPPON CATALYTIC CHEM IND [JP]); | [A]US2004013946 (ABE KOJI [JP], et al) | by applicant | EP1324418 | US2004209156 |