EP1747432 - IMAGING METHOD AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.04.2014 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Maven Technologies, LLC 9911 Pico Boulevard Los Angeles, CA 90034 / US | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RASSMAN, William 9911 West Pico Blvd., $30 Los Angeles, California 90035 / US | 02 /
RALIN, David 317 Monterey Road, 29 South Pasadena, California 91030 / US | 03 /
LIEBERMAN, Robert A. 1309 Florwood Avenue Torrance, California 90503 / US | 04 /
KEMPEN, Lothar U. 224 1/2 Juanita Avenue Redondo Beach, California 90277 / US | 05 /
SHAPIRO, Herbert 29021 Pompano Way Laguna Niguel, California 92677 / US | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al WP Thompson 138 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/49] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P.Thompson & Co. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | ||
Former [2007/05] | Freeman, Jacqueline Carol, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. 55 Drury Lane London WC2B 5SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05746623.7 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005US16314 | Priority number, date | US20040847736 | 17.05.2004 Original published format: US 847736 | [2007/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005116598 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1747432 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 19.04.2007 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.04.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G01J4/00, G01N21/55, G01N33/53, G01N21/01 | [2007/29] | CPC: |
G01N21/211 (EP,US);
G01J4/00 (KR);
G01N21/21 (EP,US);
G01N21/253 (EP,US);
G01N21/552 (EP,US);
G01N2021/212 (EP,US);
Y10S436/805 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2007/05] | G01J4/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ABBILDUNGSVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2007/05] | English: | IMAGING METHOD AND APPARATUS | [2007/05] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL D'IMAGERIE | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 06.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 06.11.2006 | Search fee paid | 06.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.11.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 30.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/21] | 13.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   28.07.2009 | 31.05.2013 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2002021443 (VENKATASUBBARAO SRIVATSA [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0038]; figure 4 *; | [X]US6480282 (CHINOWSKY TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * column 11, line 4 - column 12, line 4 *; | [X]WO03060446 (MAVEN TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US], et al) [X] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2004207846 (RASSMAN WILLIAM [US], et al) [XP] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [XP]US2005024642 (RASSMAN WILLIAM [US], et al) [XP] 1-30* the whole document * | International search | [A]US5492840 (MALMQVIST MAGNUS [SE], et al); | [A]US5491097 (RIBI HANS O [US], et al) | by applicant | - M. BOM; E. WOLF, Principles of Optics, PERGAMON PRESS, (1991), pages 47 - 51 |