EP1751937 - ENFORCING COMPLIANCE POLICIES IN A MESSAGING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.10.2008 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.11.2008 [2008/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bluespace Group Ltd Canons Court, Victoria Street, PO Box HM 1179 Hamilton HM EX / BM | [2007/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MARSTON, Justin, Philip 143 Longmeanygate Preston PR26 6TD / GB | 02 /
HATCH, Andrew Stuart 52 Orchard Road Darlington, County Durham DL3 6HR / GB | [2007/07] | Representative(s) | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/07] | Gosnall, Toby Barker Brettell 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | Application number, filing date | 05747123.7 | 12.05.2005 | [2007/07] | WO2005GB01845 | Priority number, date | US20040570848P | 12.05.2004 Original published format: US 570848 P | US20040570861P | 12.05.2004 Original published format: US 570861 P | [2007/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005109794 | Date: | 17.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1751937 | Date: | 14.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/58, H04L29/06 | [2007/07] | CPC: |
H04L51/234 (EP,US);
H04L9/40 (EP,US);
H04L51/212 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/07] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCHSETZUNG VON EINHALTUNGSRICHTLINIEN IN EINEM NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNGSSYSTEM | [2007/07] | English: | ENFORCING COMPLIANCE POLICIES IN A MESSAGING SYSTEM | [2007/07] | French: | APPLICATION DE POLITIQUES DE CONFORMITE DANS UN SYSTEME DE MESSAGERIE | [2007/07] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/07] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2008 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/46] | 27.06.2008 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP0739115 (AT & T CORP [US]) [X] 1,7,13 * column 5, line 51 - column 6, line 54 * * figure 3A * * figure 3B * [A] 2-6,8-12,14-26; | [X]EP1085444 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-26 * abstract * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0045] * * figure 4 * * figure 5 *; | [A] - EDWARDS W K, "The design and implementation of the Montage multimedia mail system", COMMUNICATIONS FOR DISTRIBUTED APPLICATIONS AND SYSTEMS. CHAPEL HILL, APR. 18 - 19, 1991, PROCEEDINGS OF THE CONFERENCE ON COMMUNICATIONS SOFTWARE. (TRICOMM), NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19910418), vol. CONF. 4, ISBN 0-87942-649-7, pages 47 - 57, XP010039767 [A] 1-26 * abstract * * page 51, column R, line 48 - page 52, column L, line 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TRICOM.1991.152875 |