EP1749037 - PERFLUORINATED ESTERS, POLYESTER, ETHERS AND CARBONATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
MC
Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | For:IT
Ciba S.p.A. Via Pila, 6/3 Fraz. Pontecchio Marconi 40037 Sasso Marconi (BO) / IT | [2008/22] |
Former [2008/21] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
MC
Ciba Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
For:IT
Ciba Specialty Chemicals S.p.A. Via Pila, 6/3, Fraz. Pontecchio Marconi 40037 Sasso Marconi (BO) / IT | |||
Former [2007/06] | For:AT
BE
BG
CH
CY
CZ
DE
DK
EE
ES
FI
FR
GB
GR
HU
IE
IS
LI
LT
LU
MC
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Holding Inc. Klybeckstrasse 141 4057 Basel / CH | ||
For:IT
Ciba Specialty Chemicals S.p.A. Via Pila, 6/3, Fraz. Pontecchio Marconi 40037 Sasso Marconi (BO) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAZZARI, Dario Via Massarenti, 173 I-40138 Bologna / IT | 02 /
PERI, Francesca Via Paolo Bentivoglio, 8 I-40133 Bologna / IT | 03 /
BRUNNER, Martin Rosenstrasse 5 CH-4323 Wallbach / CH | 04 /
ZEDDA, Alessandro Friedensgasse 6 CH-4056 Basel / CH | [2007/06] | Representative(s) | Hoechst, Bruno Werner Bohest AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2008/31] | Hoechst, Bruno Werner BOHEST AG Postfach 160 4003 Basel / CH | ||
Former [2007/19] | Hoechst, Bruno Werner Bohest Intellectual Property A. Braun Braun Héritier Eschmann AG Holbeinstrasse 36-38 4051 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 05747200.3 | 18.05.2005 | [2007/06] | WO2005EP52267 | Priority number, date | EP20040102281 | 25.05.2004 Original published format: EP 04102281 | [2007/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005116099 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1749037 | Date: | 07.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | C08G18/00, C08L67/00 | [2007/06] | CPC: |
C08G63/6886 (EP,US);
C07C323/12 (EP,US);
C08G63/6826 (EP,US);
C08K5/372 (EP,US);
C09D167/00 (EP,US);
C14C9/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/06] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PERFLUORIERTE ESTER, POLYESTER, ETHER UND KARBONATE | [2007/06] | English: | PERFLUORINATED ESTERS, POLYESTER, ETHERS AND CARBONATES | [2007/06] | French: | ESTERS, POLYESTER, ETHERS ET CARBONATES PERFLUORES | [2007/06] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/06] | 16.03.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.12.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 11.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0690039 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-21 * page 2, line 40 - page 7, line 8 * * abstract *; | [X]EP0694532 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [X] 1-21 * page 3, line 42 - page 11, line 35 * * examples 1-10; claims 1-32 * * abstract *; | [X]US5807977 (MALIK ASLAM A [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * column 9, line 45 - column 16, line 40 * * abstract *; | [X]WO9621657 (AEROJET GENERAL CO [US], et al) [X] 1-21 * page 12, line 5 - page 16, line 25 * * abstract *; | [X]DE19943422 (BEIERSDORF AG [DE]) [X] 1-21 * page 3, line 10 - page 5, line 53 * * abstract *; | [DX]US5453248 (OLSTEIN ALAN [US]) [DX] 1-21 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 21 * * abstract *; | [DX]US6387999 (DIRSCHL FRANZ [DE], et al) [DX] 1-21 * column 1, line 52 - column 7, line 12 * * abstract * |