EP1765529 - PROCESS FOR STIMULATING PRODUCTION OF HYDROGEN FROM PETROLEUM IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Newcastle upon Tyne King's Gate Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 7RU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/22] | For all designated states University of Newcastle upon Tyne King's Gate Newcastle upon Tyne NE1 7RU / GB | ||
Former [2007/13] | For all designated states University of Newcastle upon Tyne 6 Kensington Terrace Newcastle Upon Tyne, NE1 7RU / GB | ||
For all designated states NORSK HYDRO ASA Drammensveien 264 0240 Oslo / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARTER, Stephen Richard 92 Edenwold Crescent NW Calgary, Alberta T3A 3T6 / CA | 02 /
HEAD, Ian McCutcheon 49 Windsor Crescent Ovingham Northumberland NE42 6AS / GB | 03 /
JONES, D. M. 8 Edlingham Close South Gosforth Newcastle Upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE3 1RH / GB | 04 /
ERDMANN, Michael Iduns vei 10 N-5221 Nesttun / NO | 05 /
WILHELMS, Arnd Kvernabekkveien 138 N-5243 Fana / NO | [2007/27] |
Former [2007/13] | 01 /
LARTER, Stephen Richard 92 Edenwold Crescent NW Calgary, Alberta T3A 3T6 / CA | ||
02 /
HEAD, Ian McCutcheon 49 Windsor Crescent Ovingham Northumberland NE42 6AS / GB | |||
03 /
JONES, D. M. 8 Edlingham Close South Gosforth Newcastle Upon Tyne Tyne and Wear NE3 1RH / GB | |||
04 /
ERDMANN, Michael Allegate 40 N-5007 Bergen / NO | |||
05 /
WILHELMS, Arnd Kvernabekkveien 138 N-5243 Fana / NO | Representative(s) | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/13] | Watson, Robert James, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 05747248.2 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/13] | WO2005GB02109 | Priority number, date | GB20040012059 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: GB 0412059 | [2007/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005115648 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1765529 | Date: | 28.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1765529 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B09C1/10, E21B43/22, C01B3/24, C12P3/00 | [2007/13] | CPC: |
C12P3/00 (EP,US);
B09C1/10 (EP,US);
C09K8/582 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/13] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STIMULIERUNG DER PRODUKTION VON WASSERSTOFF AUS ERDÖL IN UNTERIRDISCHEN FORMATIONEN | [2007/13] | English: | PROCESS FOR STIMULATING PRODUCTION OF HYDROGEN FROM PETROLEUM IN SUBTERRANEAN FORMATIONS | [2007/13] | French: | PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE STIMULER LA PRODUCTION D'HYDROGENE A PARTIR DU PETROLE DANS DES FORMATIONS SOUTERRAINES | [2007/13] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/13] | 14.11.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.03.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.11.2010 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 08.11.2010 | 08.11.2010 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 07.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 14.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2007 | Opposition(s) | 23.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2005 | AT | 20.07.2011 | BE | 20.07.2011 | CY | 20.07.2011 | CZ | 20.07.2011 | DK | 20.07.2011 | EE | 20.07.2011 | FI | 20.07.2011 | IT | 20.07.2011 | LT | 20.07.2011 | NL | 20.07.2011 | PL | 20.07.2011 | RO | 20.07.2011 | SE | 20.07.2011 | SI | 20.07.2011 | SK | 20.07.2011 | TR | 20.07.2011 | BG | 20.10.2011 | GR | 21.10.2011 | ES | 31.10.2011 | IS | 20.11.2011 | PT | 21.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
TR | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
BG | 20.10.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
ES | 31.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
DK | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
EE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
IT | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
RO | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
SK | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
CZ | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
CY | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | AT | 20.07.2011 | |
BE | 20.07.2011 | ||
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
SI | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
SE | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.10.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | BE | 20.07.2011 | |
FI | 20.07.2011 | ||
LT | 20.07.2011 | ||
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | ||
PT | 21.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 20.07.2011 | |
NL | 20.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5464539 (UENO YOSHIYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1,11-13* column 4, line 20 - line 45; example 1 *; | [Y]WO0168904 (EXXONMOBIL UPSTREAM RES CO [US]) [Y] 1-16 * page 3, line 19 - page 4, line 14 * * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 14 * * page 6, line 15 - page 7, line 15 * * page 8, line 1 - line 20 * * page 9, line 3 - page 11, line 10 * * page 12, line 16 - line 22 * * page 13, line 23 - page 14, line 25 * * page 15, line 14 - line 25 * * page 17, line 4 - line 26 * * claims 14,5,7,9-14,19,24,25,35 *; | [Y]WO0206503 (US ENERGY [US]) [Y] 1,2,11,14 * page 4, line 13 - line 22 * * page 5, line 15 - page 6, line 7 * * page 11, line 5 - page 14, line 26 * * page 15, line 12 - line 14; claims 1,5,14,20,29 *; | [Y]US2004050778 (NOIKE TATSUYA [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0024] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0027] * |