EP1756825 - METHOD AND APPARATUS TO EDIT A MEDIA FILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.11.2012 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.11.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 05.12.2012 [2012/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | For all designated states Intel Corporation 2200 Mission College Boulevard Santa Clara, CA 95052 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ABBATE, Jeffrey 8535 SW Wolds Drive Beaverton, OR 97007 / US | [2007/09] | Representative(s) | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/09] | Hutchinson, Glenn Stanley, et al Harrison Goddard Foote, Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05747503.0 | 13.05.2005 | [2007/09] | WO2005US16556 | Priority number, date | US20040856285 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: US 856285 | [2007/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005119680 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1756825 | Date: | 28.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G11B27/031, G11B27/34 | [2007/09] | CPC: |
G11B27/34 (EP,US);
G11B27/031 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/09] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEARBEITUNG VON MEDIENDATEIEN | [2007/09] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS TO EDIT A MEDIA FILE | [2007/09] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT D'EDITER UN FICHIER MEDIA | [2007/09] | Entry into regional phase | 13.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.10.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.10.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.10.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.10.2006 | Examination requested [2007/09] | 06.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2012/49] | 29.10.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 29.11.2012 | 29.11.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.05.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.04.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 18.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2002077807 ; | [X]US6347180 (KOTANI HIROKI [JP], et al) [X] 1-11,18 * column 3, line 50 - column 7, line 39 *; | [X]WO9924987 (SNELL & WILCOX LTD [GB], et al) [X] 1-7,11,18 * page 4, line 10 - page 6, line 3 *; | [X]JP2003256432 ; | [X]US2004078761 (OHANIAN THOMAS A [US]) [X] 1,5,9,11,17,18 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030] *; | [A]EP1187475 (SONY CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0012] - paragraph [0024] *; | [A]US2002116716 (SIDEMAN ADI [US]) [A] 1,11,12,17-19 * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0099] *; | [PA]US2004216173 (HOROSZOWSKI PETER [US], et al) [PA] 1-22 * the whole document * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20020703), vol. 2002, no. 07, & JP2002077807 A 20020315 (TELECOMMUNICATION ADVANCEMENT ORGANIZATION OF JAPAN; SONY CORP; MITSUB) [X] 1-8,11-15,18-21 * abstract * | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (20031205), vol. 2003, no. 12, & JP2003256432 A 20030912 (TELECOMMUNICATION ADVANCEMENT ORGANIZATION OF JAPAN; SONY CORP) [X] 1,2,5,6,11,18 * abstract * | [A] - OWEN S J, The future of post production, BROADCASTING CONVENTION, 1997. IBS 97., INTERNATIONAL (CONF. PUBL. 447) AMSTERDAM, NETHERLANDS 12-16 SEPT. 1997, LONDON, UK,IEE, UK, PAGE(S) 218-222, (19970912), ISBN 0-85296-694-6, XP006508759 [A] 1,5,9-11,16,18,22 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/cp:19971271 |