EP1744923 - CABRIOLET DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 23.06.2017 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2017 | Revocation of patent | published on 26.07.2017 [2017/30] | 23.06.2017 | New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valmet Automotive Oy Autotehtaankatu 14 23500 Uusikaupunki / FI | [2013/14] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states Wilhelm Karmann GmbH Karmannstrasse 1 49084 Osnabrück / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BUNSMANN, Winfried Stiegteweg 5 49143 Bissendorf / DE | 02 /
MAASS, Joachim Kurze Breede 3 49143 Bissendorf / DE | 03 /
SCHONHORST, Heiko Am Steinbrink 36 49492 Westerkappeln / DE | [2007/04] | Representative(s) | Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | [2013/26] |
Former [2010/45] | Kronthaler, Schmidt & Coll. Intellectual Property Counselors Pfarrstrasse 14 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05747530.3 | 27.04.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005DE00781 | Priority number, date | DE20041020639 | 27.04.2004 Original published format: DE102004020639 | [2007/04] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005102756 | Date: | 03.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1744923 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1744923 | Date: | 26.06.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | B60J7/20 | [2007/04] | CPC: |
B60J7/207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2007/31] |
Former [2007/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | CABRIOLETVORRICHTUNG FÜR EIN FAHRZEUG | [2007/04] | English: | CABRIOLET DEVICE FOR A VEHICLE | [2007/04] | French: | DISPOSITIF CABRIOLET POUR UN VEHICULE | [2007/04] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 03.12.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.05.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2012 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.2014
27.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Webasto-Edscha Cabrio GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft Tappe mbB Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
25.03.2014
27.03.2014
ADMISSIBLE Webasto-Edscha Cabrio GmbH Kraillinger Strasse 5 82131 Stockdorf / DE Opponent's representative advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Widenmayerstraße 4 80538 München / DE | deleted | Deletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ] | 06.05.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 17.11.2014 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 18.05.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 02.06.2016 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 02.06.2016 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 14.06.2017 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/30] | 20.06.2017 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | Appeal following opposition | 28.07.2016 | Appeal received No. T1852/16 | 11.10.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 14.06.2017 | Result of appeal procedure: revocation of the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.04.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 29.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Stay/Interruption | 29.06.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2009/41] | 01.12.2010 | Resumption of proceedings | [2010/32] | 29.06.2009 | Interruption of proceedings. Reason: legal prevention of applicant | [2010/32] | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | IT | 26.06.2013 | GB | 27.04.2015 | FR | 30.04.2015 | [2016/12] |
Former [2016/07] | IT | 26.06.2013 | |
GB | 27.04.2015 | ||
Former [2014/24] | IT | 26.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10021464 (WEBASTO VEHICLE SYS INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 3 - line 20 * * column 5, line 36 - line 42 ** figure 5 *; | [A]DE10162303 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 1, line 64 - line 65 * * column 2, line 11 - line 29 * * column 3, line 16 - line 27 * * figures 1,2 *; | [PX]DE10339274 (VALMET AUTOMOTIVE OY UUSIKAUPU [FI]) [PX] 1 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0023] * * figures 1-4 * | by applicant | EP0356640 | DE19713606 |