EP1747339 - SLIDING DOOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A DRIVE DEVICE LOCATED IN A TRANSOM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DORMA GMBH & CO. KG Breckerfelder Strasse 42-48 58256 Ennepetal / DE | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FINKE, Andreas Taubenstrasse 32 58285 Gevelsberg / DE | [2007/05] | Representative(s) | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/52] | Hager, Thomas Johannes, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05747767.1 | 10.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005EP05015 | Priority number, date | DE20041023927 | 12.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004023927 | [2007/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005111356 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1747339 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747339 | Date: | 19.12.2007 | Language: | DE | [2007/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.11.2005 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/14, E05B65/08 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
E05F15/72 (EP,US);
E05F15/643 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/22 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/246 (EP,US);
E05Y2201/434 (EP,US);
E05Y2800/25 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHIEBETÜRSYSTEM MIT EINER IN EINEM KÄMPFER ANGEORDNETEN ANTRIEBSVORRICHTUNG | [2007/05] | English: | SLIDING DOOR SYSTEM COMPRISING A DRIVE DEVICE LOCATED IN A TRANSOM | [2007/05] | French: | PORTE COULISSANTE COMPORTANT UN DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT PLACE DANS UN DORMANT DE PORTE | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 28.06.2007 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2007 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2007 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2008
14.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB, et al, et al Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/34] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2008
14.07.2008
ADMISSIBLE GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE Opponent's representative Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR, et al, et al Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/32] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
30.06.2008
GEZE GmbH Reinhold-Vöster-Strasse 21-29 71229 Leonberg / DE | 24.10.2008 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 03.02.2009 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.2009 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 16.04.2009 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 14.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.01.2012 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 26.01.2012 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 26.09.2014 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2015/17] | Appeal following opposition | 05.04.2012 | Appeal received No. T0820/12 | 04.06.2012 | Statement of grounds filed | 26.09.2014 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 26.09.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 01.10.2014 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 19.12.2007 | CZ | 19.12.2007 | EE | 19.12.2007 | IE | 19.12.2007 | LT | 19.12.2007 | NL | 19.12.2007 | PL | 19.12.2007 | RO | 19.12.2007 | SI | 19.12.2007 | SK | 19.12.2007 | BG | 19.03.2008 | GR | 20.03.2008 | IS | 19.04.2008 | AT | 10.05.2008 | LU | 10.05.2008 | PT | 19.05.2008 | BE | 31.05.2008 | MC | 31.05.2008 | HU | 20.06.2008 | FI | 10.05.2014 | GB | 10.05.2014 | IT | 10.05.2014 | TR | 10.05.2014 | ES | 11.05.2014 | SE | 11.05.2014 | CH | 31.05.2014 | DK | 31.05.2014 | LI | 31.05.2014 | FR | 02.06.2014 | [2017/46] |
Former [2015/33] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
FI | 10.05.2014 | ||
GB | 10.05.2014 | ||
IT | 10.05.2014 | ||
ES | 11.05.2014 | ||
SE | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
DK | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
FI | 10.05.2014 | ||
GB | 10.05.2014 | ||
IT | 10.05.2014 | ||
SE | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
DK | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
FR | 02.06.2014 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
FI | 10.05.2014 | ||
IT | 10.05.2014 | ||
SE | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
DK | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
FI | 10.05.2014 | ||
SE | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
DK | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
FI | 10.05.2014 | ||
SE | 11.05.2014 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
CH | 31.05.2014 | ||
LI | 31.05.2014 | ||
Former [2010/39] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
HU | 20.06.2008 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
LU | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/52] | CY | 19.12.2007 | |
CZ | 19.12.2007 | ||
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
AT | 10.05.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/27] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
BG | 19.03.2008 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/19] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
BE | 31.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/11] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
EE | 19.12.2007 | ||
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
GR | 20.03.2008 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2009/04] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
MC | 31.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/48] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
IE | 19.12.2007 | ||
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/42] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
PT | 19.05.2008 | ||
Former [2008/40] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
RO | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
SK | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/36] | CZ | 19.12.2007 | |
LT | 19.12.2007 | ||
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
IS | 19.04.2008 | ||
Former [2008/27] | LT | 19.12.2007 | |
NL | 19.12.2007 | ||
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/26] | LT | 19.12.2007 | |
PL | 19.12.2007 | ||
SI | 19.12.2007 | ||
Former [2008/25] | LT | 19.12.2007 | |
PL | 19.12.2007 | Cited in | International search | [AD]DE4415708 (DORMA GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [A]DE19700859 (GEZE GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-13 * column 3, line 22 - column 5, line 18; figure - *; | [A]DE10038867 (GEZE GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-13 * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0026] * * paragraph [0033]; figures 1,4 *; | [A]US2002157317 (VALENCIA GILBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-13* the whole document * |