Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016193335 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US59610607 | 26.06.2007 | US85198010 | 06.08.2010 | US201615009061 | 28.01.2016 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9533043 | Global Dossier | 03.01.2017 | B2 | US2014120085 | 01.05.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314036969 | 25.09.2013 | US59610607 | 26.06.2007 | US85198010 | 06.08.2010 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9255131 | Global Dossier | 09.02.2016 | B2 | US2011014628 | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US59610607 | 26.06.2007 | US85198010 | 06.08.2010 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US7785801 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2010 | B2 | US2008193454 | 14.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10724103 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2018169236 | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US59610607 | 26.06.2007 | US85198010 | 06.08.2010 | US201715675148 | 11.08.2017 | US201615009061 | 28.01.2016 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2007537197 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3382036 | Global Dossier | 03.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | EP10010159 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2348135 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2011 | A3 | EP2348135 | 27.07.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2290104 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | A3 | EP2290104 | 02.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2290103 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | A3 | EP2290103 | 02.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2287337 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | A3 | EP2287337 | 23.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2280082 | Global Dossier | 10.08.2016 | B1 | EP2280082 | 18.05.2011 | A3 | EP2280082 | 02.02.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275572 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2011 | A3 | EP2275572 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275571 | Global Dossier | 21.11.2012 | A3 | EP2275571 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2275570 | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | A3 | EP2275570 | 19.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2270209 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | A3 | EP2270209 | 05.01.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2267158 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | A3 | EP2267158 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2267157 | Global Dossier | 11.05.2011 | A3 | EP2267157 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2267156 | Global Dossier | 20.04.2011 | A3 | EP2267156 | 29.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2258869 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | A3 | EP2258869 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2258868 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | A3 | EP2258868 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2258867 | Global Dossier | 06.04.2011 | A3 | EP2258867 | 08.12.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | EP10005074 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2239340 | Global Dossier | 17.11.2010 | A3 | EP2239340 | 13.10.2010 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2820168 | Global Dossier | 20.08.2019 | C | CA2820168 | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2563671 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2005244425B | Global Dossier | 13.10.2011 | B2 | AU2005244425 | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1759013 | Global Dossier | 19.05.2010 | B1 | EP1759013 | 07.03.2007 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE468409T | 15.06.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2563671 | 24.11.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE502005009602D1 | 01.07.2010 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1759013T | 30.08.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20100412T | 30.09.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL1759013T | 29.10.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1759013T | 30.09.2010 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP05747772 | 11.05.2005 | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | WO2005EP05104 | 11.05.2005 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2005110338 | Global Dossier | 29.06.2006 | A3 | WO2005110338 | 24.11.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2018104464 | Global Dossier | 05.07.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6434444B | Global Dossier | 05.12.2018 | B2 | JP2016179986 | 13.10.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2015083576 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5796003B | Global Dossier | 21.10.2015 | B2 | JP2013032381 | 14.02.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5732369B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B2 | JP2012077085 | 19.04.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102004023187 | 01.12.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2346067T | 08.10.2010 | T3 | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1759013E | 17.08.2010 | E | Priority number | Date | DE102004023187 | 11.05.2004 | Type | Divisional application | EP2239340 | EP2280082 | EP2348135 | EP2275570 | EP2290103 | EP2275571 | EP2290104 | EP2258867 | EP2258868 | EP2258869 | EP2287337 | EP2267156 | EP2267157 | EP2270209 | EP2267158 | EP2275572 |