EP1745024 - 1-ARYL-4-SUBSTITUTED ISOQUINOLINES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.03.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis International Pharmaceutical Ltd. 131 Front Street Hamilton / BM | [2011/12] |
Former [2007/04] | For all designated states NEUROGEN CORPORATION 35 N.E. Industrial Road Branford, CT 06405 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Kyungae 259 Wiswall Road Newton, MA 02459 / US | 02 /
YUAN, Jun 40 Spruce Hill Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 03 /
MAYNARD, George, D. 27 Glenwood Road Clinton, CT 06413 / US | 04 /
HUTCHISON, Alan 27 Allison Drive Madison, CT 06443 / US | 05 /
MITCHELL, Scott 13 Morris Road East Haven, CT 06513 / US | [2007/19] |
Former [2007/04] | 01 /
LEE, Kyungae 259 Wiswall Road Newton, MA 02459 / US | ||
02 /
YUAN, Jun 40 Spruce Hill Drive Guilford, CT 06437 / US | |||
03 /
MAYNARD, George, D. 27 Glenwood Road Clinton, CT 06413 / US | |||
04 /
HUTCHISON, Alan 235 Neck Road Madison, CT 06443 / US | |||
05 /
MITCHELL, Scott 13 Morris Road East Haven, CT 06513 / US | Representative(s) | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al Boeters & Lieck Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/35] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/04] | Forstmeyer, Dietmar, et al BOETERS & LIECK Oberanger 32 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05747952.9 | 06.05.2005 | [2007/04] | WO2005US15959 | Priority number, date | US20040569182P | 08.05.2004 Original published format: US 569182 P | [2007/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005110991 | Date: | 24.11.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/47] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1745024 | Date: | 24.01.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.11.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1745024 | Date: | 25.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 24.11.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.12.2007 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/47, A61P29/00, C07D217/02 | [2007/52] | CPC: |
C07D405/12 (EP,US);
A61K31/47 (EP,US);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P11/06 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
C07D217/14 (EP,US);
C07D217/16 (EP,US);
C07D217/22 (EP,US);
C07D401/04 (EP,US);
C07D401/06 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/04] | C07D217/02, A61K31/47 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/04] | Title | German: | 1-ARYL-4-SUBSTITUIERTE ISOCHINOLINE | [2011/47] | English: | 1-ARYL-4-SUBSTITUTED ISOQUINOLINES | [2007/04] | French: | ISOQUINOLINES 1-ARYL-4-SUBSTITUEES | [2007/04] |
Former [2007/04] | 1-ARYL-4-SUBSTITUIERTES ISOCHINOLIN | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2006 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2006 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/04] | 24.01.2007 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time | 15.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.09.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 28.01.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2008 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   08.04.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.05.2005 | AT | 25.04.2012 | BE | 25.04.2012 | CY | 25.04.2012 | CZ | 25.04.2012 | DK | 25.04.2012 | EE | 25.04.2012 | FI | 25.04.2012 | LT | 25.04.2012 | NL | 25.04.2012 | PL | 25.04.2012 | RO | 25.04.2012 | SE | 25.04.2012 | SI | 25.04.2012 | SK | 25.04.2012 | TR | 25.04.2012 | IE | 06.05.2012 | LU | 06.05.2012 | CH | 31.05.2012 | LI | 31.05.2012 | MC | 31.05.2012 | BG | 25.07.2012 | GR | 26.07.2012 | IS | 25.08.2012 | PT | 27.08.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
LU | 06.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
TR | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
BG | 25.07.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/20] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
IE | 06.05.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
CZ | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
RO | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
SK | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
EE | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
DK | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
NL | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 25.04.2012 | |
BE | 25.04.2012 | ||
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
CH | 31.05.2012 | ||
LI | 31.05.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/04] | BE | 25.04.2012 | |
CY | 25.04.2012 | ||
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/03] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
MC | 31.05.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2013/01] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
PT | 27.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
SI | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
GR | 26.07.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 25.04.2012 | |
FI | 25.04.2012 | ||
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
PL | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
IS | 25.08.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 25.04.2012 | |
LT | 25.04.2012 | ||
SE | 25.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 25.04.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO9827066 (NEUROGEN CORP [US], et al) [X] 1,41,42 * example -; claims 1,9-21 *; | [X]WO03028730 (NOVARTIS AG [CH], et al) [X] 1,2,41 * example -; claim - *; | [X] - S. TANDEL ET AL., "convenient synthesis of 1-substituted derivatives of 4-(1-propenyl)- and 4-allyl-3-aminoisoquinolines.", HETEROCYCLES., NLELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS B.V. AMSTERDAM., (2000), vol. 53, no. 5, pages 1183 - 1191, XP002458881 [X] 1,2 * page 1183 - page 1190 * | International search | [X]US4260611 (BARTMANN WILHELM, et al); | [X]US4282223 (BARTMANN WILHELM, et al); | [X] - HENRY R. ET AL., "Reactions of Epimeric 2,2'-diacetyl-1,1'2,2'-tetrahydro-1,1'-biisoquinolines.", ORG. CHEM., (1972), vol. 37, no. 21, pages 3206 - 3209, XP002990751 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jo00986a002 | by applicant | WO03028730 | WO03082828 |