EP1754014 - COLLECTOR TANK FOR A MULTI-ROW HEAT EXCHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.05.2012 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Behr Industry GmbH & Co. KG Heilbronner Strasse 380 70469 Stuttgart / DE | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BERGMILLER, Jörg Robert-Koch-Str. 58 73760 Ostfildern / DE | 02 /
SEEGER, Thomas Christophstrasse 52 70771 Leinfelden-Echterdingen / DE | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | Bernhard, Uwe BRP Renaud & Partner mbB Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Steuerberater Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/27] | Bernhard, Uwe BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2011/23] | Bernhard, Uwe BRP Renaud & Partner Rechtsanwälte Notare Patentanwälte Königstrasse 28 70173 Stuttgart / DE | ||
Former [2007/08] | Mantel, Berthold Friedrich Behr GmbH & Co. KG Intellectual Property, G-IP Mauserstrasse 3 70469 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 05748081.6 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005EP05759 | Priority number, date | DE20041026688 | 28.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004026688 | [2007/08] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005116561 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1754014 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1754014 | Date: | 06.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | F28F9/02 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
F28D1/05383 (EP,US);
F28F9/0219 (EP,US);
F28F9/0226 (EP,US);
F28F2225/08 (EP,US);
F28F2275/085 (EP,US);
F28F2275/205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SAMMELKASTEN FÜR EINEN MEHRREIHIGEN WÄRMETAUSCHER | [2007/08] | English: | COLLECTOR TANK FOR A MULTI-ROW HEAT EXCHANGER | [2007/08] | French: | BAC COLLECTEUR POUR ECHANGEUR THERMIQUE A PLUSIEURS LIGNES | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 28.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 28.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 07.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2010 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 27.05.2005 | CY | 06.07.2011 | CZ | 06.07.2011 | DK | 06.07.2011 | EE | 06.07.2011 | FI | 06.07.2011 | IE | 06.07.2011 | IT | 06.07.2011 | LT | 06.07.2011 | NL | 06.07.2011 | PL | 06.07.2011 | RO | 06.07.2011 | SE | 06.07.2011 | SI | 06.07.2011 | SK | 06.07.2011 | TR | 06.07.2011 | BG | 06.10.2011 | GR | 07.10.2011 | IS | 06.11.2011 | PT | 07.11.2011 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
TR | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
BG | 06.10.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/31] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
DK | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/23] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
EE | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
IT | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
RO | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
SK | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/21] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
CZ | 06.07.2011 | ||
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IE | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 06.07.2011 | |
FI | 06.07.2011 | ||
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/11] | FI | 06.07.2011 | |
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
PL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/10] | FI | 06.07.2011 | |
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SE | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
GR | 07.10.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/09] | FI | 06.07.2011 | |
LT | 06.07.2011 | ||
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
PT | 07.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/08] | LT | 06.07.2011 | |
NL | 06.07.2011 | ||
SI | 06.07.2011 | ||
IS | 06.11.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | SI | 06.07.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS63280966 ; | [A]GB598771 (MORRIS MOTORS LTD, et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB724017 (STANLEY WINN) [A] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [A]GB1303040 (SOCIETE ANONYME DES USINES CHAUSSON) [A] 1-16 * figure - *; | [XA]GB2082312 (IMI RADIATORS) [X] 1-3,7,12 * the whole document * [A] 14,16; | [X]US2003159813 (BALDANTONI ANTONIO [US]) [X] 1,7,8,16 * figure - * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890227), vol. 013, no. 083, Database accession no. (M - 802), & JP63280966 A 19881117 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1-16 * abstract * |