EP1763731 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IN VIRTUAL 3D SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2007/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IN VIRTUAL 3D SPACE AND SYSTEM FOR SELECTING AN OPERATION VIA A VISUALIZING SYSTEM | ||
[2010/17] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3D for All Számítástechnikai Fejlesztö Kft. Rákóczi út 68. 2. em 14 1074 Budapest / HU | [2010/42] |
Former [2007/12] | For all designated states 3D for all Számítástechnikai Fejlesztö KFT. Rákóczi út 68. 2. em 14 1074 Budapest / HU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RÁTAI, Dániel Rakoczi ut 68 H-1074, Budapest / HU | [2010/42] |
Former [2007/12] | 01 /
RATAI, Daniel Rakoczi ut 68 H-1074, Budapest / HU | Representative(s) | Kereszty, Marcell Gödölle, Kékes, Mészaros & Szabo Patent and Trademark Attorneys Keleti Karoly u. 13/b. 1024 Budapest / HU | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Kereszty, Marcell Gödölle, Kékes, Mészaros & Szabo Patent and Trademark Attorneys Keleti Karoly u. 13/b. 1024 Budapest / HU | Application number, filing date | 05748262.2 | 24.05.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005HU00056 | Priority number, date | HU20040001034 | 24.05.2004 Original published format: HU 0401034 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005116809 | Date: | 08.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/49] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1763731 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763731 | Date: | 20.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 06.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | G06F3/01, G06F3/033 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
G06F3/012 (EP,US);
G02B27/0093 (EP,US);
G02B30/24 (EP,US);
G06F3/011 (EP,US);
G06F3/0325 (EP,US);
G06F3/0346 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2007/12] | G06F3/033 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM OPERIEREN IN EINEM VIRTUELLEN 3D-RAUM | [2010/17] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IN VIRTUAL 3D SPACE | [2010/17] | French: | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DESTINES A UN ESPACE TRIDIMENSIONNEL VIRTUEL | [2010/17] |
Former [2007/12] | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM OPERIEREN IN EINEM VIRTUELLEN 3D-RAUM UND SYSTEM ZUM AUSWÄHLEN EINER OPERATION ÜBER EIN VISUALISIERUNGSSYSTEM | ||
Former [2007/12] | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATING IN VIRTUAL 3D SPACE AND SYSTEM FOR SELECTING AN OPERATION VIA A VISUALIZING SYSTEM | ||
Former [2007/12] | SYSTEME ET PROCEDE DESTINES A UN ESPACE TRIDIMENSIONNEL VIRTUEL ET SYSTEME PERMETTANT DE SELECTIONNER UN FONCTIONNEMENT VIA UN SYSTEME DE VISUALISATION | Entry into regional phase | 13.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 13.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 13.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 11.01.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.04.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 18.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.04.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.10.2010 | BE | 20.10.2010 | CY | 20.10.2010 | CZ | 20.10.2010 | DK | 20.10.2010 | EE | 20.10.2010 | FI | 20.10.2010 | LT | 20.10.2010 | NL | 20.10.2010 | PL | 20.10.2010 | RO | 20.10.2010 | SE | 20.10.2010 | SI | 20.10.2010 | SK | 20.10.2010 | TR | 20.10.2010 | BG | 20.01.2011 | GR | 21.01.2011 | IS | 20.02.2011 | PT | 21.02.2011 | IE | 24.05.2011 | LU | 24.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/26] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CY | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 24.05.2011 | ||
LU | 24.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 24.05.2011 | ||
LU | 24.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/20] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
IE | 24.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 20.10.2010 | ||
DK | 20.10.2010 | ||
EE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
PL | 20.10.2010 | ||
RO | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
SK | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 20.10.2010 | |
BE | 20.10.2010 | ||
FI | 20.10.2010 | ||
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
NL | 20.10.2010 | ||
SE | 20.10.2010 | ||
SI | 20.10.2010 | ||
BG | 20.01.2011 | ||
GR | 21.01.2011 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
PT | 21.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | FI | 20.10.2010 | |
LT | 20.10.2010 | ||
IS | 20.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 20.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US5227985 (DEMENTHON DANIEL F [US]) [X] 1-11,27-37,50-55,58-65 * abstract * * column 3, line 10 - line 49 * * column 5, line 8 - column 6, line 29; figure 1 * * column 17, line 52 - column 18, line 51; figures 11,12 * [A] 12,17,18,38,43,44,56; | [A]US6456432 (LAZZARO GERARD M [US], et al) [A] 13-16,39-42 * column 3, line 20 - line 50 *; | [X]EP1335317 (DEUTSCH ZENTR LUFT & RAUMFAHRT [DE]) [X] 1-37,50-65 * column 3, line 43 - column 4, line 31 * * column 6, line 25 - column 7, line 23; figures 1,3 *; | [X]US2004008337 (BOMAN DUANE [US]) [X] 1-37,50-65 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 29 - page 3, paragraph 46; figures 1-3 * * page 4, paragraph 51 * * page 4, paragraph 63 *; | [A]US2004075676 (ROSENBERG LOUIS B [US], et al) [A] 27,28* page 1, paragraph 10 *; | [X] - FOLEY J D, "INTERFACES FOR ADVANCED COMPUTING", SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN, SCIENTIFIC AMERICAN INC., NEW YORK, NY, US, (19871001), vol. 257, no. 4, ISSN 0036-8733, pages 82 - 86,88, XP000098988 [X] 38-49 * the whole document * | by applicant | US5227985 | DE10106850 | EP1335317 | WO03079179 | GB2388418 |