EP1761409 - DISPLAY DEVICE, VEHICLE, METHOD FOR DISPLAYING, PROGRAM FOR DISPLAYING AND RECORDING MEDIUM OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.03.2016 [2016/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | For all designated states Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | ||
Former [2007/11] | For all designated states SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA 22-22, Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 545-8522 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITOH, Megumi 606-56-305 Sanjo-cho Nara-shi Nara 630-8244 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Toshiya 95 Oazasatokoazanakamori Kamo-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto 619-1152 / JP | 03 /
OTA, Shinichirou 2-5-20 Ayameikeminami Nara-shi Nara 631-0033 / JP | 04 /
MIAKE, Aki 1-2-30 Gakuenmidorigaoka Nara-shi Nara 631-0026 / JP | 05 /
YAMAMOTO, Takeshi 37-32 6-chome Hikaridai Seika-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | 06 /
SATO, Keiichiro 7-2-20-404 Omiya-cho Nara-shi Nara 630-8115 / JP | [2014/16] |
Former [2007/11] | 01 /
ITOH, Megumi 606-56-305 Sanjo-cho Nara-shi Nara 630-8244 / JP | ||
02 /
TAKAHASHI, Toshiya 95 Oazasatokoazanakamori Kamo-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto 619-1152 / JP | |||
03 /
OTA, Shinichirou 2-5-20 Ayameikeminami Nara-shi Nara 631-0033 / JP | |||
04 /
MIAKE, Aki 1-2-30 Gakuenmidorigaoka Nara-shi Nara 631-0026 / JP | |||
05 /
YAMAMOTO, Takeshi 37-32 6-chome Hikaridai Seika-cho Soraku-gun Kyoto 619-0237 / JP | |||
06 /
SATO, Keiichiro 7-2-20-404 Omiya-cho Nara-shi Nara 630-8115 / JP | Representative(s) | Treeby, Philip David William, et al Maucher Jenkins Seventh Floor Offices Artillery House 11-19 Artillery Row London SW1P 1RT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/13] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al RGC Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2013/51] | Treeby, Philip David William, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | ||
Former [2007/11] | Brown, Kenneth Richard, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 05748470.1 | 02.06.2005 | [2007/11] | WO2005JP10545 | Priority number, date | JP20040169168 | 07.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004169168 | [2007/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005120881 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1761409 | Date: | 14.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1761409 | Date: | 25.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60K35/00, G01D7/00 | [2007/11] | CPC: |
B60K35/60 (EP,US);
B60K35/211 (EP,US);
B60K35/213 (EP,US);
B60K35/215 (EP,US);
B60K35/29 (EP,US);
G01D7/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2007/37] |
Former [2007/11] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ANZEIGEVORRICHTUNG, ANZEIGEVERFAHREN, ANZEIGEPROGRAMM UND AUFZEICHNUNGSMEDIUM DAFÜR | [2007/11] | English: | DISPLAY DEVICE, VEHICLE, METHOD FOR DISPLAYING, PROGRAM FOR DISPLAYING AND RECORDING MEDIUM OF SAME | [2007/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'AFFICHAGE, VÉHICULE, MÉTHODE D'AFFICHAGE, PROGRAMME D'AFFICHAGE ET SUPPORT D'ENREGISTREMENT DE CELUI-CI | [2007/11] | Entry into regional phase | 02.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Search fee paid | 02.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/11] | 29.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.10.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.06.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 24.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 16.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP10187712.4 / EP2298587 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.06.2009 | Opposition(s) | 05.01.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10008211 (MANNESMANN VDO AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,11,13,16-19* the whole document *; | [X]DE10109905 (TEGETHOFF MARIUS [DE]) [X] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03057523 (JOHNSON CONTROLS TECH CO [US], et al) [A] 1,7,8,11,13,16-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO03074327 (COATO WORKSHOP INC [JP], et al) [A] 1,6,11,13,16-19 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JPS57110984 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD); | [A]JPS63144690U ; | [Y]JPH08159815 (JAPAN ENGINE VALVE MFG); | [A]JPH10297318 (FURUKAWA ELECTRIC CO LTD); | [Y]JPH1120507 (YAZAKI CORP); | [Y]JP2003315108 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [Y]US6721634 (HAULER PETER [DE], et al) |