EP1790388 - GYMFLEXOR TRAINING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.11.2009 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.11.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.12.2009 [2009/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mukenev, Yerzhan Karymgazy-uly Almagul, 48-18 Almaty, 050060 / KZ | [2007/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2007/22] | Representative(s) | Jeck, Anton Jeck, Fleck & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Herrmann Klingengasse 2 71665 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | ||
Former [2007/22] | Jeck, Anton Jeck - Fleck - Hermann Klingengasse 2/1 71657 Vaihingen/Enz / DE | Application number, filing date | 05748518.7 | 26.01.2005 | [2007/22] | WO2005KZ00001 | Priority number, date | KZ20040001426 | 09.08.2004 Original published format: KZ 041426 | [2007/22] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2006016791 | Date: | 16.02.2006 | Language: | DE | [2006/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1790388 | Date: | 30.05.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2006 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 16.02.2006 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A63B19/00, A63B21/00 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
A63B21/0004 (EP,US);
A63B21/055 (EP,KR,US);
A63B21/02 (KR);
A63B2208/0204 (EP,US);
A63B2208/0252 (EP,US);
A63B2225/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2007/22] | A63B19/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GYMFLEXTOR-TRAININGSGERÄT | [2007/22] | English: | GYMFLEXOR TRAINING DEVICE | [2007/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT UNIVERSEL | [2007/22] | Entry into regional phase | 08.03.2007 | Translation filed | 09.03.2007 | National basic fee paid | 09.03.2007 | Search fee paid | 09.03.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.03.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: RU | 09.03.2007 | Examination requested [2007/22] | 30.06.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2009/52] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2009/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5895309 (SPECTOR DONALD [US]) [A] 1* the whole document * | International search | [A]WO02102468 (MEKENEV ERZHAN KARYMGAZY-ULY [KZ]); | [A]US4475662 (MANDEL GOETZ [DE]); | [A]RU2056880 (PETROV IVAN I [RU], et al); | [A]SU1729540 (UNIV PETROZ [SU]) | by applicant | WO02102468 |