EP1758597 - USE OF DRUG COMBINATIONS FOR TREATING INSULIN RESISTANCE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.07.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Diamedica Inc. 6 - 1200 Waverley Street Winnipeg Manitoba R3T 0P4 / CA | [2007/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAUTT, Wayne, W. 2104-1960 St. Mary's Road Winnipeg, Manitoba R3N 4M7 / CA | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/37] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/35] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/10] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05748807.4 | 20.05.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005CA00775 | Priority number, date | US20040572486P | 20.05.2004 Original published format: US 572486 P | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005112949 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1758597 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1758597 | Date: | 12.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 01.12.2005 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/702, A61P3/10, A61P5/50, A61K31/27, A61K31/198, A61K31/155, A61K31/4439, A61K31/451, A61K31/5377, A61K31/4965, A61K31/519, A61K31/00 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61K31/155 (EP,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,US);
A61K31/27 (EP,US);
A61K31/4439 (EP,US);
A61K31/451 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965 (EP,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/702 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/04 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/155, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/27, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/4439, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K31/451, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/4965, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/519, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377, A61K2300/00 (EP,US); | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Title | German: | VERWENDUNG VON ARZNEIMITTELKOMBINATIONEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER INSULINRESISTENZ | [2007/10] | English: | USE OF DRUG COMBINATIONS FOR TREATING INSULIN RESISTANCE | [2007/10] | French: | UTILISATION DE COMBINAISONS MEDICAMENTEUSES POUR TRAITER LA RESISTANCE A L'INSULINE | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 10.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.06.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 13.06.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.03.2009 | Opposition(s) | 13.06.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 20.05.2005 | AT | 12.09.2012 | BE | 12.09.2012 | CY | 12.09.2012 | CZ | 12.09.2012 | DK | 12.09.2012 | EE | 12.09.2012 | FI | 12.09.2012 | IT | 12.09.2012 | LT | 12.09.2012 | MC | 12.09.2012 | NL | 12.09.2012 | PL | 12.09.2012 | RO | 12.09.2012 | SE | 12.09.2012 | SI | 12.09.2012 | SK | 12.09.2012 | TR | 12.09.2012 | BG | 12.12.2012 | GR | 13.12.2012 | ES | 23.12.2012 | IS | 12.01.2013 | PT | 14.01.2013 | IE | 20.05.2013 | LU | 20.05.2013 | CH | 31.05.2013 | LI | 31.05.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
TR | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 20.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
IE | 20.05.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
CH | 31.05.2013 | ||
LI | 31.05.2013 | ||
Former [2014/03] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
MC | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/37] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
IT | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
DK | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
BG | 12.12.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/31] | AT | 12.09.2012 | |
BE | 12.09.2012 | ||
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/28] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
PT | 14.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/23] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
PL | 12.09.2012 | ||
RO | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
SK | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/22] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
CZ | 12.09.2012 | ||
EE | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
NL | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
ES | 23.12.2012 | ||
IS | 12.01.2013 | ||
Former [2013/20] | BE | 12.09.2012 | |
CY | 12.09.2012 | ||
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
SE | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
SI | 12.09.2012 | ||
GR | 13.12.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 12.09.2012 | |
FI | 12.09.2012 | ||
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 12.09.2012 | |
LT | 12.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 12.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO03061648 (LAUTT WAYNE W [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,20,28-35 * page 11, line 1 - page 12, line 40 * * claims 9-12 *; | [X]WO03061638 (LAUTT WAYNE W [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,19,28-35 * page 9, line 3 - page 11, line 7 * * claims 10-16,22-31 *; | [X]WO03061639 (LAUTT W WAYNE [CA], et al) [X] 1-21,28-36 * page 6, lines 14-21 * * page 7, lines 4-18 * * page 10, line 24 - page 11, line 47 * * example 2 * * claim - *; | [PA] - LAUTT W WAYNE, "A new paradigm for diabetes and obesity: the hepatic insulin sensitizing substance (HISS) hypothesis", JOURNAL OF PHARMACOLOGICAL SCIENCES, (200405), vol. 95, no. 1, ISSN 1347-8613, pages 9 - 17, XP002463281 [PA] 1-36 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1254/jphs.95.9 | [XA] - CHARPENTIER GUILLAUME, "Oral combination therapy for type 2 diabetes.", DIABETES/METABOLISM RESEARCH AND REVIEWS 2002 SEP-OCT, (200209), vol. 18 Suppl 3, ISSN 1520-7552, pages S70 - S76, XP002463282 [X] 1 * page S72, column 2, paragraph 4 - page S75, column 1, paragraph 1 * [A] 1-36 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/dmrr.278 | International search | [Y]US5561165 (LAUTT W WAYNE [CA], et al); | [X]CA2415392 (KERI PHARMA KFT [HU]); | [X]CA2465632 (PFIZER PROD INC [US]); | [A] - LAUTT W.W., "The HISS story overview: a novel hepatic neurohumoral regulation of peripheral insulin sensitivity in health and diabetes", CAN. J. PHYSIOL. PHARMACOL., (1999), vol. 77, pages 553 - 562, XP009011015 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1139/cjpp-77-8-553 | by applicant | US5561165 | WO0019992 | WO03061648 | WO03061638 | WO03061639 |