EP1775660 - MUTUAL ACCESS METHOD OF DATA AND MUTUAL ACCESS SYSTEM OF DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.06.2009 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2009 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | For all designated states Yokogawa Electric Corporation 9-32, Nakacho 2-chome, Musashino-shi Tokyo 180-8750 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SATO, Masahito, c/o YOKOGAWA ELECTRIC CORPORATION 9-32, Naka-cho, 2-chome Musashino-shi, Tokyo 1808750 / JP | [2007/16] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/16] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05749062.5 | 10.06.2005 | [2007/16] | WO2005JP10712 | Priority number, date | JP20040183404 | 22.06.2004 Original published format: JP 2004183404 | [2007/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005124571 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1775660 | Date: | 18.04.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F15/00, G05B19/05, G06F9/54 | [2007/16] | CPC: |
H04L67/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2007/39] |
Former [2007/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GEGENSEITIGES ZUGANGSVERFAHREN FÜR DATEN UND GEGENSEITIGES ZUGANGSSYSTEM FÜR DATEN | [2007/16] | English: | MUTUAL ACCESS METHOD OF DATA AND MUTUAL ACCESS SYSTEM OF DATA | [2007/16] | French: | MÉTHODE D'ACCÈS MUTUEL DE DONNÉES ET SYSTÈME D'ACCÈS MUTUEL DE DONNÉES | [2007/16] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2006 | Translation filed | 21.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2006 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 21.12.2006 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/16] | 16.06.2009 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2009/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2009 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPH11184508 (TOSHIBA CORP); | [A]JP2000268016 (OMRON TATEISI ELECTRONICS CO); | [A]JP2002132501 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A] - KUDO K ET AL, "Shinraisei Kojo o Hakatta Soft PLC no Kyaka Kino to Jitsukatsuyo.", INSTRUMENTATION, CONTROL, ENGINEERING., (19981201), vol. 41, no. 12, pages 76 - 80, XP002987000 |