EP1759298 - BUS CONTROLLER FOR TRANSFERRING DATA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.01.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.2011 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY, TR | published on 09.11.2011 [2011/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NXP B.V. High Tech Campus 60 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2007/31] |
Former [2007/10] | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V. Groenewoudseweg 1 5621 BA Eindhoven / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHANG, Yeow, K. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | 02 /
MOO, Weng, F. c/o Prof. Holstlaan 6 NL-5656 AA Eindhoven / NL | [2007/10] | Representative(s) | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property and Licensing Red Central 60 High Street, Redhill Surrey RH1 1NY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/09] | Williamson, Paul Lewis, et al NXP Semiconductors UK Ltd. Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2008/45] | White, Andrew Gordon NXP Semiconductors Intellectual Property Department Betchworth House 57-65 Station Road Redhill Surrey RH1 1DL / GB | ||
Former [2008/36] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Intellectual Property & Standards Cross Oak Lane Redhill Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | ||
Former [2007/10] | White, Andrew Gordon Philips Electronics UK Limited, Patents and Trade Marks Department, Cross Oak Lane Redhill, Surrey RH1 5HA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749086.4 | 09.06.2005 | [2007/10] | WO2005IB51898 | Priority number, date | EP20040102728 | 15.06.2004 Original published format: EP 04102728 | [2007/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005124567 | Date: | 29.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1759298 | Date: | 07.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1759298 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | G06F13/38 | [2007/10] | CPC: |
G06F13/22 (EP,US);
G06F13/10 (KR);
G06F13/12 (KR);
G06F13/42 (KR);
G06F13/4282 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/10] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BUS-CONTROLLER ZUR DATENÜBERTRAGUNG | [2007/10] | English: | BUS CONTROLLER FOR TRANSFERRING DATA | [2007/10] | French: | CONTROLEUR DE BUS POUR LE TRANSFERT DE DONNEES | [2007/10] | Entry into regional phase | 15.01.2007 | National basic fee paid | 15.01.2007 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.01.2007 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.01.2007 | Examination requested [2007/10] | 08.09.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.12.2008 | Fee for grant paid | 29.12.2008 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.11.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.07.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.06.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 25.02.2009 | BE | 25.02.2009 | CY | 25.02.2009 | CZ | 25.02.2009 | DK | 25.02.2009 | EE | 25.02.2009 | FI | 25.02.2009 | IT | 25.02.2009 | LT | 25.02.2009 | NL | 25.02.2009 | PL | 25.02.2009 | RO | 25.02.2009 | SI | 25.02.2009 | SK | 25.02.2009 | TR | 25.02.2009 | BG | 25.05.2009 | SE | 25.05.2009 | GR | 26.05.2009 | ES | 05.06.2009 | IE | 09.06.2009 | LU | 09.06.2009 | IS | 25.06.2009 | CH | 30.06.2009 | LI | 30.06.2009 | MC | 30.06.2009 | PT | 12.08.2009 | HU | 26.08.2009 | [2011/44] |
Former [2011/32] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 09.06.2009 | ||
LU | 09.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
HU | 26.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/22] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 09.06.2009 | ||
LU | 09.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/16] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
IT | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 09.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2011/01] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
GR | 26.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 09.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/21] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IE | 09.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
CH | 30.06.2009 | ||
LI | 30.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/12] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
BG | 25.05.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2010/07] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
MC | 30.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | ||
Former [2009/52] | AT | 25.02.2009 | |
BE | 25.02.2009 | ||
CZ | 25.02.2009 | ||
DK | 25.02.2009 | ||
EE | 25.02.2009 | ||
FI | 25.02.2009 | ||
LT | 25.02.2009 | ||
NL | 25.02.2009 | ||
PL | 25.02.2009 | ||
RO | 25.02.2009 | ||
SI | 25.02.2009 | ||
SK | 25.02.2009 | ||
SE | 25.05.2009 | ||
ES | 05.06.2009 | ||
IS | 25.06.2009 | ||
PT | 12.08.2009 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2003005197 (ABRAMSON DARREN L [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 4, paragraph 35 - page 5, paragraph 39 *; | [A]US2003101311 (CHANG YEOW KHAI [SG], et al) [A] 1-7 * page 3, paragraph 50 - page 6, paragraph 73 *; | [A]US2004093441 (LEETE BRIAN A [US]) [A] 1-7* the whole document * |