EP1747706 - SUPPORT WITH SOLDER GLOBULE ELEMENTS AND A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY OF SUBSTRATES WITH GLOBULE CONTACTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.01.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2010 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB | published on 23.06.2010 [2010/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Infineon Technologies AG St.-Martin-Strasse 53 81669 München / DE | [2007/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAUER, Michael Dachgred 31 93152 Nittendorf / DE | 02 /
BEMMERL, Thomas Am Danneracker 3 92421 Schwandorf / DE | 03 /
FÜRGUT, Edward Ligusterweg 2 86453 Dasing / DE | 04 /
JEREBIC, Simon Hermann-Köhl-Str. 14 93049 Regensburg / DE | 05 /
VILSMEIER, Hermann Flösserstr. 14 93059 Regensburg / DE | [2007/13] |
Former [2007/05] | 01 /
BAUER, Michael Dachgred 31 93152 Nittendorf / DE | ||
02 /
BEMMERL, Thomas Am Gsteinert 3 92421 Schwandorf / DE | |||
03 /
FÜRGUT, Edward Ligusterweg 2 86453 Dasing / DE | |||
04 /
JEREBIC, Simon Hermann-Köhl-Str. 14 93049 Regensburg / DE | |||
05 /
VILSMEIER, Hermann Flösserstr. 14 93059 Regensburg / DE | Representative(s) | Schäfer, Horst Schweiger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstrasse 35 80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/05] | Schäfer, Horst Schweiger & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Karlstrasse 35 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05749703.4 | 17.05.2005 | [2007/05] | WO2005DE00892 | Priority number, date | DE20041025279 | 19.05.2004 Original published format: DE102004025279 | [2007/05] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005115072 | Date: | 01.12.2005 | Language: | DE | [2005/48] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1747706 | Date: | 31.01.2007 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1747706 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 13.04.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H05K13/00 | [2007/05] | CPC: |
H05K3/3478 (EP,US);
H05K13/00 (KR);
B23K3/0623 (EP,US);
H01L21/4853 (EP,US);
H01L21/6835 (EP,US);
H01L23/3128 (EP,US);
H01L24/11 (EP,US);
H01L24/12 (EP,US);
H01L24/16 (EP,US);
H01L25/105 (EP,US);
B23K2101/40 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05571 (EP,US);
H01L2224/05573 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11003 (EP,US);
H01L2224/11334 (EP,US);
H01L2224/13099 (EP,US);
H01L2224/16225 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1023 (EP,US);
H01L2225/1058 (EP,US);
H01L23/49805 (EP,US);
H01L2924/00014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01004 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01015 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01032 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01052 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01068 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01074 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01084 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/12042 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15311 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15331 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
H05K2201/0108 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/00014, H01L2224/05599 (US,EP);
H01L2924/12042, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2007/34] |
Former [2007/05] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TRÄGER MIT LOTKUGELELEMENTEN UND EIN VERFAHREN ZUM BESTÜCKEN VON SUBSTRATEN MIT KUGELKONTAKTEN | [2007/05] | English: | SUPPORT WITH SOLDER GLOBULE ELEMENTS AND A METHOD FOR ASSEMBLY OF SUBSTRATES WITH GLOBULE CONTACTS | [2007/05] | French: | SUPPORT A ELEMENTS SPHERIQUES A BRASER ET PROCEDE POUR EQUIPER DES SUBSTRATS DE CONTACTS SPHERIQUES | [2007/05] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2006 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2006 | Examination requested [2007/05] | 19.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.2007 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.10.2008 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.01.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 19.01.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.12.2009 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 02.06.2009 | GB | 25.06.2009 | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/24] | FR | 02.06.2009 | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0840368 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 2, line 8 - page 5, line 45 *; | [X]EP0955676 (TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]) [X] 1-6* page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 42; figures 1-16 *; | [X]US6071801 (WACHTLER KURT P [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 49 - column 6, line 45; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US6080650 (EDWARDS DARVIN R [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 2, line 41 - column 7, line 6; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US6239013 (HOTCHKISS GREGORY B [US]) [X] 1-6 * column 3, line 57 - column 8, line 23; figures 1-10 *; | [X]US6303407 (HOTCHKISS GREGORY B [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * column 4, line 24 - column 5, line 40; figures 1-5 * |