EP1754359 - AKA SEQUENCE NUMBER FOR REPLAY PROTECTION IN EAP-AKA AUTHENTICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.05.2011 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.06.2011 [2011/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | [2007/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SAHASRABUDHE, Meghana 373 River Oaks Circle San Jose, CA 95134 / US | 02 /
HAVERINEN, Henry Einonkuja 10 as. 3 FIN-40250 Jyvaskyla / FI | 03 /
SHOU, Gung Ming 2920 San Simeon Way Plano, TX 75023 / US | [2007/08] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2007/08] | TBK-Patent Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 05749773.7 | 07.06.2005 | [2007/08] | WO2005IB01594 | Priority number, date | US20040577194P | 07.06.2004 Original published format: US 577194 P | [2007/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2005120156 | Date: | 22.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/51] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1754359 | Date: | 21.02.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 16.03.2006 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2007/08] | CPC: |
H04L9/12 (EP,US);
H04L63/08 (EP,US);
H04L9/0844 (EP,US);
H04L9/3271 (EP,US);
H04W12/043 (EP,US);
H04W12/06 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/08] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AKA-SEQUENZNUMMER ZUM REPLAY-SCHUTZ BEI DER EAP-AKA-AUTHENTIFIKATION | [2007/08] | English: | AKA SEQUENCE NUMBER FOR REPLAY PROTECTION IN EAP-AKA AUTHENTICATION | [2007/08] | French: | NUMERO DE SEQUENCE AKA DESTINE A UNE PROTECTION DE REPONSE DANS UNE AUTHENTIFICATION EAP-AKA | [2007/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2006 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2006 | Examination requested [2007/08] | 28.06.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.01.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/25] | 03.02.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.06.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2010 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2365687 (VODAFONE LTD [GB]); | [A]GB2365688 (VODAFONE LTD [GB]); | [A]WO02052784 (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al); | [T]US2005251681 (ROBLES LUIS R [ES], et al) | [A] - ARKKO J ET AL, "Extensible Authentication Protocol Method for UMTS Authentication Key Agreement (EAP-AKA).", INTERNET DRAFT., (20040405), pages 1 - 75, URL: http://ietfreport.isoc.org/all-ids/draft-haverinen-pppext-eap-sim-13.txt-394392.txt, XP003005745 | [A] - ARKKO J ET AL, "EAP AKA Authentication.", NOKIA INTERNET DRAFT., (200202), XP003005730 |