EP1763602 - FORMATION OF LEATHER SHEET MATERIAL USING HYDROENTANGLEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2011 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E-LEATHER LIMITED Kingsbridge Centre Sturrock Way Peterborough PE3 8TZ / GB | [2007/12] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEVAN, Christopher, Graham 11 Austin Street Stamford Lincs PE9 2QR / GB | [2007/12] | Representative(s) | Wilson Gunn Blackfriars House The Parsonage 5th Floor Manchester M3 2JA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2007/12] | Wilson Gunn 5th Floor Blackfriars House The Parsonage Manchester M3 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 05749818.0 | 27.05.2005 | [2007/12] | WO2005GB02136 | Priority number, date | GB20040012380 | 03.06.2004 Original published format: GB 0412380 | [2007/12] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2005118932 | Date: | 15.12.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1763602 | Date: | 21.03.2007 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.12.2005 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2007/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1763602 | Date: | 27.10.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 15.12.2005 | Classification | IPC: | D04H1/46, C14C13/00, D04H1/48 | [2007/12] | CPC: |
B32B29/02 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/492 (KR);
C14C13/00 (GB,KR);
B32B5/26 (KR,US);
B32B5/06 (KR,US);
D04H1/4274 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/465 (GB);
D04H1/48 (GB);
D04H1/485 (KR);
D04H1/49 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/498 (EP,KR,US);
D04H1/54 (GB);
D04H1/541 (KR);
D04H13/00 (EP,KR,US);
B32B2262/02 (KR,US);
B32B2262/08 (KR,US);
B32B2262/14 (KR,US);
B32B2305/20 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2007/12] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | YU | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON LEDERARTIGEM FLÄCHENGEBILDE DURCH WASSERSTRAHLVERWIRBELUNG | [2007/12] | English: | FORMATION OF LEATHER SHEET MATERIAL USING HYDROENTANGLEMENT | [2007/12] | French: | FORMATION D'UN MATERIAU DE CUIR EN FEUILLES AU MOYEN DE LIAGE PAR JET D'EAU | [2007/12] | Entry into regional phase | 30.11.2006 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2006 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2006 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2006 | Examination requested [2007/12] | 06.08.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.02.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.12.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.07.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.09.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.09.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.05.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.10.2010 | EE | 27.10.2010 | HU | 27.10.2010 | LT | 27.10.2010 | PL | 27.10.2010 | RO | 27.10.2010 | SI | 27.10.2010 | SK | 27.10.2010 | BG | 27.01.2011 | IS | 27.02.2011 | LU | 27.05.2011 | MC | 31.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
LU | 27.05.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
MC | 31.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CZ | 27.10.2010 | |
EE | 27.10.2010 | ||
LT | 27.10.2010 | ||
PL | 27.10.2010 | ||
RO | 27.10.2010 | ||
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
SK | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/32] | LT | 27.10.2010 | |
SI | 27.10.2010 | ||
BG | 27.01.2011 | ||
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/23] | LT | 27.10.2010 | |
IS | 27.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/19] | LT | 27.10.2010 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6264879 (ADDIE BENJAMIN A [US], et al); | [AD]WO0194673 (B & H RES LTD [GB], et al); | [XD]WO03048437 (B & H RES LTD [GB], et al) |