Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP1747028
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
24.04.2009 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |
30.12.2008 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
30.12.2008 |
Change: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.07.2008 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
27.07.2007 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.08.2007 [2007/35] |
18.07.2007 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.05.2007 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2007 |
First examination report |
|
10.03.2007 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
29.12.2006 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] |
29.12.2006 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.01.2007 [2007/05] |
28.12.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
23.11.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.06.2006 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.09.2005 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|